Bama Icee LLC v. J & J Snack Foods Corp et al
Plaintiff: Bama Icee LLC and Bama Icee Southern LLC
Defendant: Daniel Fachner, Gerald Shreiber, J & J Snack Foods Corp, Icee of America Inc and The Ice Company Inc
Case Number: 7:2018cv01327
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Western Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Before this Court is Defendant J & J Snack Foods Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss #16 and Defendant ICEE of America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss #17 . Plaintiffs have fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motions. Plaintiffs' responses shall not exceed twenty (20) double-spaced pages. Defendants will thereafter have ten (10) days to file a reply. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/16/2018. (PSM)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/25/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/16/2019. Joint Status Report due by 4/9/2019. Jury Trial set for 9/16/2019 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/10/2018. (PSM)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/9/2018. (PSM)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER The parties have informed the Court that they wish to engage in discovery before the Court rules on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #3 . Therefore, the Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #3 is terminated as moot. Plaintiffs are to inform the Court when the motion is ripe and ready to be litigated. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/9/2018. (PSM)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on October 9, 2018. (EBV)
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Icee of America Inc. (Knight, Sam)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by J & J Snack Foods Corp, The Ice Company Inc. (Brown, Scott)
October 2, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bama Icee Southern LLC, Bama Icee LLC. Daniel Fachner served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Dana, John)
September 28, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50, receipt number B4601092316 (TLM, )
September 27, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Scheduling Conference held on 9/27/2018. (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller.) (PSM)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Jeffrey Goldfarb by J & J Snack Foods Corp, The Ice Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cert of Good Standing)(Brown, Scott)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Brown on behalf of J & J Snack Foods Corp, The Ice Company Inc (Brown, Scott)
September 17, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 2:00 PM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. (PSM)
September 14, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Telephone Conference held on 9/14/2018. (PSM)
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B Driver on behalf of Icee of America Inc (Driver, Christopher)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sam D Knight on behalf of Icee of America Inc (Knight, Sam)
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brannon J Buck on behalf of Icee of America Inc (Buck, Brannon)
September 5, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 9/14/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call (877) 336-1828 and use Access Code: 3967498 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference.(PSM)
September 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Telephone Conference held on 9/5/2018. (PSM)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bama Icee Southern LLC, Bama Icee LLC. Icee of America Inc served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (TLM, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bama Icee LLC, Bama Icee Southern LLC of Gerald Shreiber (Dana, John)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bama Icee Southern LLC, Bama Icee LLC. The Ice Company Inc served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (KEK)
August 31, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 9/5/2018 at 2:00 PM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call (877) 336-1828 and use Access Code: 1966344 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference.(PSM)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bama Icee LLC, Bama Icee Southern LLC on J&J Snack Foods Corp. (Dana, John)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Icee of America Inc, The Ice Company Inc mailed certified mail. (TLM, )
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Daniel Fachner, J & J Snack Foods Corp, Gerald Shreiber. del to plaintiff (TLM, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bama Icee LLC, Bama Icee Southern LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Ex. A-B to Ex. 1 attached), #2 Exhibit Ex. C to Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. C cont. to Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Ex. D to Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Ex. E to Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Ex. F to Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit Ex. G to Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit Ex. H to Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit Ex. I to Exhibit 1, #10 Exhibit Ex. J to Exhibit 1, #11 Exhibit Ex. K to Exhibit 1, #12 Exhibit Ex. L to Exhibit 1, #13 Exhibit Ex. M to Exhibit 1, #14 Exhibit Ex. N to Exhibit 1, #15 Exhibit Ex. O to Exhibit 1, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Dana, John)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Bama Icee LLC, Bama Icee Southern LLC. (Dana, John)
August 20, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601091444. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Fachner, Icee of America Inc, J & J Snack Foods Corp, Gerald Shreiber, The Ice Company Inc (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Bama Icee Southern LLC, Bama Icee LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(TLM, ). (Dana, John) Modified on 8/20/2018 (TLM, ).
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Daniel Fachner, Icee of America Inc, J & J Snack Foods Corp, Gerald Shreiber, The Ice Company Inc (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Bama Icee Southern LLC, Bama Icee LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(TLM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bama Icee LLC v. J & J Snack Foods Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Fachner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Shreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J Snack Foods Corp
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Scott S Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icee of America Inc
Represented By: Brannon J Buck
Represented By: Sam D Knight
Represented By: Christopher B Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ice Company Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Scott S Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bama Icee LLC
Represented By: Odeh John Issis
Represented By: James A Stewart
Represented By: Francois M Blaudeau
Represented By: John G Dana
Represented By: Bruce L Gordon
Represented By: Evan Taylor Rosemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bama Icee Southern LLC
Represented By: Odeh John Issis
Represented By: James A Stewart
Represented By: Francois M Blaudeau
Represented By: John G Dana
Represented By: Bruce L Gordon
Represented By: Evan Taylor Rosemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?