Cyrus v. Pen-Tech Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Naomi Cyrus
Defendant: Game Technology Source, Inc., Pen-Tech Associates, Inc. and Encore Gaming Group
Case Number: 7:2018cv01365
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Western Office
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Counsel for Defendants has notified the Court that a settlement agreement has been reached in this matter. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Any party may, for good cause shown, reopen this action within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/15/2018. (PSM)
October 15, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Telephone Conference held on 10/15/2018. (PSM)
September 5, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call (877) 336-1828 and use Access Code 3967498 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference.(PSM)
September 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Telephone Conference held on 9/5/2018. (PSM)
August 29, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 9/5/2018 at 1:30 PM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call (877) 336-1828 and use Access Code 3967498 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference.(PSM)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:18-cv-00654. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 27, 2018 Case transferred to The Northern District of Alabama; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to the Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry)(alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/27/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that dfts' #5 motion to transfer is granted, and that this case is transferred to US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 USC 1406(a); DIRECTING the clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/27/2018.]
August 3, 2018 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re #5 MOTION to Transfer filed by Game Technology Source, Inc., Pen-Tech Associates, Inc.. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #5 -1 for pdf) (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/27/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer by Game Technology Source, Inc., Pen-Tech Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer)(Vickers, David) Modified on 8/3/2018 to clarify the docket text and to remove Encore Gaming Group as a filer as they were not listed on the pleading (wcl, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/27/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford J. Griffin on behalf of Game Technology Source, Inc., Pen-Tech Associates, Inc. (Griffin, Bradford) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/27/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties shall file briefs, with citations to proper legal authorities, by 8/3/2018, as to whether the court is required to remand this case due to the filing of the notice of removal in the wrong district, or may transfer it to the Northern District of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/13/2018. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/27/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Game Technology Source, Inc., Pen-Tech Associates, Inc. re: filing of #1 Notice of Removal. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/27/2018.]
July 10, 2018 ANSWER with JURY DEMAND to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM with JURY DEMAND against Naomi Cyrus by Pen-Tech Associates, Inc., Game Technology Source, Inc.. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/27/2018.]
July 10, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Naomi Cyrus. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/27/2018.]
July 10, 2018 COMPLAINT against Encore Gaming Group, Game Technology Source, Inc., Pen-Tech Associates, Inc., filed by Naomi Cyrus. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/27/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Game Technology Source, Inc., Pen-Tech Associates, Inc. from Circuit Court of Greene County, Alabama, case number 35-cv-2018-900049.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602049991) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Answer/Counterclaim, #3 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt) (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/27/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cyrus v. Pen-Tech Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Game Technology Source, Inc.
Represented By: David W Vickers
Represented By: Bradford J Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pen-Tech Associates, Inc.
Represented By: David W Vickers
Represented By: Bradford J Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encore Gaming Group
Represented By: David W Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Cyrus
Represented By: Lawrence F Johnson
Represented By: Michael G Trucks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?