Schoerner v. Max Express Inc et al
Plaintiff: Christian Schoerner
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company, Max Express Inc and Ismailov Validjanovich Zokhid
Case Number: 7:2018cv01761
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDING- with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 11/28/2018. (PSM)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Geico Indemnity Company.(Wells, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants, filed by Christian Schoerner.(Lowell, Craig)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER It appears to this Court that subject matter jurisdiction may be lacking in the above styled action. Plaintiff is hereby DIRECTED to file an amended complaint within eleven (11) days of this Order to properly allege subject matter jurisdiction, otherwise the above styled action will be DISMISSED. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 11/6/2018. (PSM)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Christian Schoerner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Lowell, Craig)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Christian Schoerner. (Lowell, Craig)
November 1, 2018 Filing fee received in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3209613; USDC receipt number: B4601093182; related document #1 COMPLAINT against Geico Indemnity Company, Max Express Inc, Ismailov Validjanovich Zokhid, filed by Christian Schoerner.(TLM)(Lowell, Craig) Modified on 11/2/2018 (KWC)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Geico Indemnity Company, Max Express Inc, Ismailov Validjanovich Zokhid, filed by Christian Schoerner.(TLM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schoerner v. Max Express Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: David R Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismailov Validjanovich Zokhid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Schoerner
Represented By: Craig L Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?