Gene Vandenham Worldwide Inc. v. Zuppardo et al
Plaintiff: Gene Vandenham Worldwide Inc
Defendant: Scott Zuppardo and Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC
Case Number: 7:2018cv01821
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Western Office
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting (25) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 7:17-cv-01939-LSC. The Clerk of Court is hereby ORDERED to consolidate Gene Vandenham Worldwide, Inc. v. Scott Zuppardo, et al., 7:18-cv-01821-LSC with McPherson, et al. v. Gene Vandenham Worldwide, Inc., 7:17-cv-01939-LSC for the purposes of pretrial proceedings. For all future filings, all parties shall file documents in the lead case, McPherson, et al. v. Gene Vandenham Worldwide, Inc., Case No. 7:17-cv-01739-LSC.Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 12/12/2018. Associated Cases: 7:17-cv-01939-LSC, 7:18-cv-01821-LSC(PSM)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 12/6/2018. (PSM)
December 4, 2018 Filing 24 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC, Scott Zuppardo.(Gresham, Cole)
November 2, 2018 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 7:18-cv-00083. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #16 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/2/2018. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge James C. Dever III in Raleigh: Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2018 regarding #16 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC, Scott Zuppardo, #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC, Scott Zuppardo. Counsel for both parties present. Court hears argument from both parties on the motions. Court denies the Motion to Dismiss and grants the motion to transfer. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Amy Condon) (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
October 23, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #16 MOTION to Transfer Case. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #16 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC, Scott Zuppardo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Gresham, Cole) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #16 MOTION to Transfer Case: Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 1 before District Judge James C. Dever III. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 10/17/2018. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #16 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Gene Vandenham Worldwide Inc.. (Whorton, Amanda) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support regarding #16 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC, Scott Zuppardo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E) (Gresham, Cole) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC, Scott Zuppardo. (Gresham, Cole) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Cole R. Gresham on behalf of All Defendants. (Gresham, Cole) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III regarding #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC, Scott Zuppardo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Northern District of Alabama Order) (Bowman, Marla) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gene Vandenham Worldwide Inc.. (Whorton, Amanda) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support regarding #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC, Scott Zuppardo. (Bowman, Marla) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC, Scott Zuppardo. (Bowman, Marla) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC (Bowman, Marla) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Scott Zuppardo (Bowman, Marla) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Marla Spector Bowman on behalf of All Defendants. (Bowman, Marla) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Ryal W. Tayloe on behalf of All Defendants. (Tayloe, Ryal) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Gene Vandenham Worldwide Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Zuppardo Process Server's Return of Service Form, #2 Exhibit B - Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC Process Server's Proof of Service Form) (Whorton, Amanda) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC, Scott Zuppardo. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas Glenn Varnum on behalf of Gene Vandenham Worldwide Inc.. (Varnum, Thomas) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Gene Vandenham Worldwide Inc. (Whorton, Amanda) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Amanda M. Whorton on behalf of Gene Vandenham Worldwide Inc.. (Whorton, Amanda) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC, Scott Zuppardo ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4512334.), filed by Gene Vandenham Worldwide Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - License Agreements, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons for Scott Zuppardo, #4 Proposed Summons for Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC) (Whorton, Amanda) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 11/2/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gene Vandenham Worldwide Inc. v. Zuppardo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Zuppardo
Represented By: Cole Robinson Gresham
Represented By: Marla Spector Bowman
Represented By: Ryal W. Tayloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornelius Chapel Records, LLC
Represented By: Cole Robinson Gresham
Represented By: Marla Spector Bowman
Represented By: Ryal W. Tayloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Vandenham Worldwide Inc
Represented By: Thomas Glenn Varnum
Represented By: Amanda M. Whorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?