United States of America v. Hardin

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Andrea Hardin
Case Number: 7:2019cv00091
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Before this Court is the United States of America's Complaint #1 and Defendant Andrea Hardin's answer #5 . The Court is setting this matter for a hearing on March 26, 2019 at 1:30 PM, at the United States Federal Building and Courthouse, Tuscaloosa, Alabama, before Judge L. Scott Coogler. At the hearing, the Court will consider Hardin's request for an extension, and whether the Government's request for an injunction should be granted. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/20/2019. (PSM)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/20/2019. (PSM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Andrea Hardin.(TLM, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Andrea Hardin on 2/3/2019, filed by United States of America. (Sholian, Margaret)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Andrea Hardin served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (TLM, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America. del to USM (TLM, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrea Hardin, filed by United States of America.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jay E Town, US Attorney
Represented By: Margaret Sholian
Represented By: Richard E O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?