United States of America v. Wesley

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: L Stewart Wesley
Case Number: 7:2019cv00153
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL- The United States of America filed a Notice of Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Doc. #7 ); It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED, that the above-styled action and all claims stated therein are DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/20/19. (MRR, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America (O'Neal, Richard)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER COMPELLING RESPONDENT TO COMPLY WITH INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE SUMMONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/17/19. (MRR, )
April 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/17/2019; Respondent Ms. Wesley appeared pro se; AUSA Clint Locke for gov't; updates provided by counsel; order to be entered; hrg adj. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (ASL)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- This matter is before the court on the Motion to Continue to allow the United States Marshal additional time to serve the respondent; The motion is GRANTED; It is ORDERED that the respondent, L. Stewart Wesley, shall appear before the undersigned magistrate judge on April 17, 2019, at 10:00 A.M.; The United States Marshal is hereby DIRECTED to serve a copy of the foregoing Order personally upon the respondent, and to make due return of said service. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/8/19. (MRR, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Continue the Hearing Scheduled for April 9, 2019 Motion is RIPE 4/8/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by United States of America. (O'Neal, Richard) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (MRR, ).
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- It is ORDERED that the respondent, L. Stewart Wesley, shall appear before the undersigned on April 9, 2019, at 10:00 A.M., in Courtroom 3B, Hugo L. Black U.S. Courthouse, and at that time show cause why he should not be required to obey the summons to appear before the Revenue Officer and to produce the papers required in the summons served on the respondent or to suffer an adjudication of contempt of court for failing to obey said summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 3/25/19. (MRR, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Wesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Jay E Town
Represented By: Richard E O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L Stewart Wesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?