McDaniel v. Mylan Inc et al
Plaintiff: Rene McDaniel
Defendant: Mylan Technologies Inc, Mylan Inc, Dr. Diana Waldrep, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc and CVS Pharmacy Inc
Case Number: 7:2019cv00209
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw #11 Response in Opposition to Motion /Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Response by CVS Pharmacy Inc, Mylan Inc, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Radney, W)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc, Mylan Inc, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc. (Radney, W)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 Brief re #9 MOTION to Dismiss . (Sydnor, James)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Sydnor, James)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rene McDaniel. (Yearout, J)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Rene McDaniel. (Yearout, J)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Before this Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. #4 . Defendants have fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motion. Plaintiffs will thereafter have ten (10) days to file a reply. Also before this Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Stay. #5 This Motion is DENIED. Even if this case is remanded, the Motion to Dismiss will still need to be decided. Accordingly, briefing on the Motion to Dismiss may continue while the Court determines if remand is proper. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 3/6/2019. (PSM)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay by Rene McDaniel. (Yearout, J)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Rene McDaniel. (Yearout, J)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Before this Court is Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Mylan Technologies Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. #1 -3 at 219.) Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause as to why this motion should not be granted. Plaintiff's submission should not exceed twenty (20) double-spaced pages and is due ten (10) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/27/2019. (PSM)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/4/2019. (PSM)
February 4, 2019 MOTION to Dismiss by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc. (see #1 at Exhibit C page 219 (PSM)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Inc, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc from Circuit Court of Pickens County, case number 54-cv-2018-900058., filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Inc, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Mylan Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies Inc
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: W Larkin Radney, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: W Larkin Radney, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Diana Waldrep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: W Larkin Radney, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: James Allen Sydnor, Jr
Represented By: W Larkin Radney, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene McDaniel
Represented By: J Gusty Yearout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?