Friend et al v. Team Health Inc et al
Plaintiff: Dr Thomas J Kelly, Dr Jimmy S Tu, Dr Inkil Hwangpo, University Emergency Physicians Group Inc, Dr Eric Curley, Dr Martin James Smith, Dr Alisa Johnson, Dr John Olen Newcomb and Dr. Richard D Friend
Defendant: Paragon Contracting Services LLC, Team Health Inc and Paragon Contracting Services LLC f/k/a Paragon Contracting Services Inc. D/B/A Team Primary Care Physicians of Alabama Inc
Case Number: 7:2019cv00491
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2020. Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2020. Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 6/5/2019. (PSM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Eric Curley, Richard D Friend, Inkil Hwangpo, Alisa Johnson, Thomas J Kelly, John Olen Newcomb, Martin James Smith, Jimmy S Tu, University Emergency Physicians Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply)(Snyder, Daniel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim Paragon's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim or For a More Definite Statement filed by Paragon Contracting Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Starling, M)
May 23, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Snyder, Daniel)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Before this Court is Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. #18 Defendants have fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motion. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/14/2019. (PSM)
May 13, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Eric Curley, Richard D Friend, Inkil Hwangpo, Alisa Johnson, Thomas J Kelly, John Olen Newcomb, Martin James Smith, Jimmy S Tu, University Emergency Physicians Group Inc. (Snyder, Daniel)
May 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by University Emergency Physicians Group Inc (Snyder, Daniel)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on May 2, 2019. (EBV)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on May 2, 2019. (EBV)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants have already answered Plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on May 2, 2019. (EBV)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paragon Contracting Services LLC, Team Health Inc. filed by Paragon Contracting Services LLC, Team Health Inc (Starling, M)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses and Paragon Contracting Services, LLC's, First COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief against All Plaintiffs by Team Health Inc, Paragon Contracting Services LLC.(Starling, M)
April 23, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $50, receipt number B4601096994- Peter Goldman (MRR, )
April 23, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $50, receipt number B4601096993 -Bethany J.M. Pandher (MRR, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion for Pro Hac Vice and proposed Order for Bethany Pandher by Paragon Contracting Services LLC, Team Health Inc. (Starling, M)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order for Peter Goldman by Paragon Contracting Services LLC, Team Health Inc. (Starling, M)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/22/2019. (PSM)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable L. Scott Coogler. Please use case number 7:19-cv-491-LSC on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Serve a Responsive Pleading Motion is RIPE 4/17/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Paragon Contracting Services LLC, Team Health Inc. (Starling, M) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (MRR, ).
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Team Health Inc served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (MRR, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Paragon Contracting Services LLC served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (MRR, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Paragon Contracting Services LLC and Team Health Inc. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 28th day of March, 2019. (JLC)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Eric Curley, Richard D Friend, Inkil Hwangpo, Alisa Johnson, Thomas J Kelly, John Olen Newcomb, Martin James Smith, Jimmy S Tu, University Emergency Physicians Group Inc. (MRR, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paragon Contracting Services LLC, Team Health Inc, filed by John Olen Newcomb, Eric Curley, Inkil Hwangpo, Martin James Smith, Alisa Johnson, Richard D Friend, Jimmy S Tu, Thomas J Kelly, University Emergency Physicians Group Inc.(MRR, )
March 27, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3310260, NDAL receipt #B4601096356. (Snyder, Daniel) Modified on 3/28/2019 (JLC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friend et al v. Team Health Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr Thomas J Kelly
Represented By: Floyd D Gaines
Represented By: Daniel B Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr Jimmy S Tu
Represented By: Floyd D Gaines
Represented By: Daniel B Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr Inkil Hwangpo
Represented By: Floyd D Gaines
Represented By: Daniel B Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University Emergency Physicians Group Inc
Represented By: Floyd D Gaines
Represented By: Daniel B Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr Eric Curley
Represented By: Floyd D Gaines
Represented By: Daniel B Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr Martin James Smith
Represented By: Floyd D Gaines
Represented By: Daniel B Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr Alisa Johnson
Represented By: Floyd D Gaines
Represented By: Daniel B Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr John Olen Newcomb
Represented By: Floyd D Gaines
Represented By: Daniel B Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Richard D Friend
Represented By: Floyd D Gaines
Represented By: Daniel B Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragon Contracting Services LLC
Represented By: Ryan M Hodinka
Represented By: Peter Ronai Goldman
Represented By: M Jefferson Starling, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan M Hodinka
Represented By: Peter Ronai Goldman
Represented By: M Jefferson Starling, III
Represented By: Bethany Jane Matilda Pandher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragon Contracting Services LLC f/k/a Paragon Contracting Services Inc. D/B/A Team Primary Care Physicians of Alabama Inc
Represented By: Ryan M Hodinka
Represented By: Peter Ronai Goldman
Represented By: M Jefferson Starling, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?