Williams v. Quest Liner Inc et al

Plaintiff: Lacie Williams
Defendant: Quest Liner Inc and Kenney Martin Thomas, IV
Case Number: 7:2019cv00533
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/3/2019. (PSM)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/3/2019. (PSM)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER The Court has received the parties proposed HIPAA Protective Order. ( #14 -1.) The parties are directed to the Qualified HIPAA Protective Order attached as Appendix I to the Court's Uniform Initial Order. (See #6 Appendix I.) Once the parties present to the Court a "qualified protective order" in a substantially similar form to the form attached to the Court's Uniform Initial Order, a Qualified HIPAA Protective Order will be entered in this case. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/3/2019. (PSM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Protective Order by Quest Liner Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Protective Order)(Windsor, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Hipaa Order by Quest Liner Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed HIPAA Order)(Windsor, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kenney Martin Thomas, IV.(Ross, Brett)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lacie Williams. Kenney Martin Thomas, IV served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Glover, R)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quest Liner Inc. filed by Quest Liner Inc (Ross, Brett)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/15/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2020. Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/29/2019. (PSM)
May 29, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Scheduling Conference held on 5/29/2019. (PSM)
May 22, 2019 NOTICE of RESETTING Hearing (TIME CHANGE ONLY): Scheduling Conference RESET for 5/29/2019 at 11:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. (PSM)
May 9, 2019 NOTICE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2019 at 2:00 PM in chambers, Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. At least one attorney for each party must attend the conference in person.(PSM)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert David Windsor on behalf of Quest Liner Inc (Windsor, Robert)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 Alias Summons Issued as to Kenney Martin Thomas, IV; returned by mail to pla for service. (KWC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ross, Brett)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/22/2019. (PSM)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Lacie Williams as to Kenney Martin Thomas, IV. (JLC)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Quest Liner Inc.(Ross, Brett)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed (certified mail) as to Quest Liner Inc served on "NO DATE ON GREEN CARD"; answer due 5/6/2019. (KWC)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Quest Liner Inc, Kenney Martin Thomas, IV. (TLM, )
April 5, 2019 Filing Fee paid by R Matt Glover in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3317572; USDC receipt number B4601096630; related document #1 COMPLAINT against Quest Liner Inc, Kenney Martin Thomas, IV, filed by Lacie Williams.(PSM). (Glover, R) Modified on 4/5/2019 (KWC)
April 5, 2019 Request for service by certified mail filed by Lacie Williams. As stated in complaint #1 . (PSM)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quest Liner Inc, Kenney Martin Thomas, IV, filed by Lacie Williams.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Quest Liner Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Liner Inc
Represented By: Robert David Windsor
Represented By: Brett A Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenney Martin Thomas, IV
Represented By: Brett A Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacie Williams
Represented By: Gerald Glasco Baxter
Represented By: R Matt Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?