Agnew v. Phifer Incorporated
Plaintiff: Anita Agnew
Defendant: Pfifer Incorporated and Phifer Incorporated
Case Number: 7:2019cv00964
Filed: June 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Amend. #9 The motion #9 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to change the case caption in this matter from "Anita Agnew v. Pfifer Incorporated" to "Anita Agnew v. Phifer Incorporated.". Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/19/2019. (PSM)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Case Caption by Pfifer Incorporated. (Tartt, Clayton)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E Holmes on behalf of Pfifer Incorporated (Holmes, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/17/2019. (PSM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pfifer Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Corporate Disclosure and Certificate of Interested Persons)(Tartt, Clayton)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Clayton R Tartt on behalf of Pfifer Incorporated (Tartt, Clayton)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anita Agnew. Pfifer Incorporated served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (KEK)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pfifer Incorporated via certified U.S. Mail on this the 26th day of June, 2019. (JLC)
June 24, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3375925, NDAL receipt #B4601098605.(Gill, Patricia) Modified on 6/24/2019 (JLC).
June 23, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Anita Agnew. (PSM)
June 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pfifer Incorporated, filed by Anita Agnew.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agnew v. Phifer Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Agnew
Represented By: Patricia A Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfifer Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phifer Incorporated
Represented By: Clayton R Tartt
Represented By: Jeffrey E Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?