Bankfirst Capital Corporation et al v. Sanders et al
Plaintiff: Bankfirst Capital Corporation and Bankfirst Financial Services
Defendant: Petit Jean State Bank, United States of America, Carson D Sanders and Roger D Sanders
Case Number: 7:2019cv01072
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE- Letter to the Court by Carson D Sanders (provided for filing by Roger Sanders) (MRR, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE- Letter to the Court by Roger D Sanders (MRR, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER- Although the deadline for doing so has passed, Pltfs have yet to serve Defts Roger D. Sanders and Carson D. Sanders; It is ORDERED that, on or before September 3, 2019, pltf shall cause, if any exists, as to why the claims against those defts should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/27/19. (MRR, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America.(O'Neal, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER- United States of America's Motion to Intervene as a party defendant is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge M. Bradley Almond on 6/20/19.-Deemed filed 6/20/19, Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa County (Doc 1-12 p.2) (MRR, )
July 10, 2019 RESPONSE to Motion re MOTION to Intervene filed by Petit Jean State Bank.-Deemed filed 5/10/19, Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa County (Doc 1-10 p.2) (MRR, )
July 10, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by Petit Jean State Bank.-Deemed filed 5/10/19, Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa County (Doc 1-9 p.2)(MRR, )
July 10, 2019 MOTION to Intervene by United States of America.- Deemed filed 4/30/19, Circuit Court of Tuscloosa County (Doc 1-7 p.2) (MRR, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER OF INTERPLEADER- The relief sought by Plaintiffs in said Complaint is due to be granted. Signed by Judge M. Bradley Almond on 4/5/19.- Deemed filed 4/5/19, Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa County (Doc 1-2 p.2)(MRR, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Circuit Court of Tuscloosa, case number 63-cv-2019-900409., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bankfirst Capital Corporation et al v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bankfirst Capital Corporation
Represented By: Robert P Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bankfirst Financial Services
Represented By: Robert P Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petit Jean State Bank
Represented By: Jeffrey C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Richard E O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson D Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger D Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?