Waits v. Kubota Tractor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: John O Waits
Defendant: Kubota Tractor Corporation, Kubota Corporation, Martin Truck and Tractor Company Inc, H&R Agri-Power Company Inc, Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation, Marty Sanders and Kubota Manufacturing of America Corporation
Case Number: 7:2019cv01080
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John O Waits. Marty Sanders served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Taylor, Richard)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2020. Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/15/2021 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/28/2019. (PSM)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Marty Sanders. (Russell, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY Brief filed by Defendants Kubota Manufacturing of America Corporation, Kubota Tractor Corporation re: #9 Brief - on the Issue of Fraudulent Joinder - filed by Kubota Manufacturing of America Corporation, Kubota Tractor Corporation. (Walston, David)
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 Alias Summons Issued as to Kubota Corporation and Marty Sanders, returned to Plaintiff for service via USPS on this the 13th day of August, 2019. (JLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Elliott, Edgar)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation, Kubota Manufacturing of America Corporation, Kubota Tractor Corporation. filed by Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation, Kubota Manufacturing of America Corporation, Kubota Tractor Corporation (Macklem, Jonathan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to re #9 On The Issue of Fradulent Joinder filed by John O Waits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Taylor, Richard)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Martin Truck and Tractor Company Inc. (Russell, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation.(Macklem, Jonathan)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H&R Agri-Power Company Inc. filed by H&R Agri-Power Company Inc (Boone, Jess)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by H&R Agri-Power Company Inc.(Boone, Jess)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kubota Manufacturing of America Corporation.(Macklem, Jonathan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Brief Addressing the Fraudulent Joinder of the Two Alabama-Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Donald M. Sanders)(Macklem, Jonathan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John O Waits. H&R Agri-Power Company Inc served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Taylor, Richard)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Amend. #5 The motion #5 is GRANTED, and this Court sets forth the following briefing schedule on the issue of fraudulent joinder. Defendants have eleven (11) days from the date of this Order to file a brief on the issue of fraudulent joinder. Plaintiff will thereafter have eleven (11) days to file a response. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/19/2019. (PSM)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John O Waits. Martin Truck and Tractor Company Inc served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Taylor, Richard)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Order, Court's July 15, 2019 Order by Kubota Tractor Corporation. (Smith, Richard)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER It appears to the Court that one or more of the Defendants named in this action are citizens of the State of Alabama and thus are citizens of the same state as Plaintiff. If the Plaintiff is able to obtain service over these Defendants, this case will be remanded to the Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa County, Alabama. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/15/2019. (PSM)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/12/2019. (PSM)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kubota Tractor Corporation.(Elliott, Edgar)
July 11, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3387723, NDAL receipt #B4601099056. (Macklem, Jonathan) Modified on 7/11/2019 (JLC).
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kubota Manufacturing of America Corporation, Kubota Tractor Corporation, Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation from Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa County, Alabama, case number 63-cv-2019-900727, filed by Kubota Manufacturing of America Corporation, Kubota Tractor Corporation, Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waits v. Kubota Tractor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John O Waits
Represented By: J Douglas McElvy
Represented By: Richard H Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kubota Tractor Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan W Macklem
Represented By: Edgar M Elliott, IV
Represented By: Richard E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kubota Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Truck and Tractor Company Inc
Represented By: John A Russell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&R Agri-Power Company Inc
Represented By: Jess S Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan W Macklem
Represented By: Edgar M Elliott, IV
Represented By: Richard E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Sanders
Represented By: John A Russell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kubota Manufacturing of America Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan W Macklem
Represented By: Edgar M Elliott, IV
Represented By: Richard E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?