Chapman v. City of West Blocton et al
Plaintiff: Dana Chapman
Defendant: Jennifer Kay Shine and City of West Blocton
Case Number: 7:2019cv01102
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/9/2019. (PSM)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jennifer Kay Shine.(JLC)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dana Chapman. City of West Blocton served but date of delivery omitted. (Bailey, Matthew) Modified on 9/3/2019 (JLC).
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dana Chapman. (Bailey, Matthew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dana Chapman. Jennifer Kay Shine served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Bailey, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dana Chapman.(Bailey, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by A Courtney Crowder on behalf of City of West Blocton (Crowder, A)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of West Blocton, Jennifer Kay Shine returned to Plaintiff via USPS for service on this the 12th day of August, 2019. (JLC)
August 1, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, receipt number B4601099481. (JLC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of West Blocton, Jennifer Kay Shine, filed by Dana Chapman.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. City of West Blocton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Chapman
Represented By: Matthew Aaron Bailey
Represented By: Leroy Maxwell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Kay Shine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of West Blocton
Represented By: A Courtney Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?