Hutchinson v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Dr. Matthew Hutchinson
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 7:2019cv01168
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act / Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:7703
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 8/07/2019. (TLM2)
July 31, 2019 PHV Fee paid for Joshua Kahns in the amount of $75.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3402214, NDAL receipt #B4601099509. (Kahn, Joshua) Modified on 8/1/2019 (JLC).
July 31, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3402208, NDAL receipt #B4601099508. (Kahn, Joshua) Modified on 8/1/2019 (JLC).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Before the Court is Joshua Kahns Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Doc. #2 .) The Court has no record that Kahn has paid the requisite pro hac vice fee. Accordingly, Kahn has until 5:00 PM on August 7, 2019 to pay the pro hac vice fee or his motion will be denied. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/31/2019. (KEK)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Matthew Hutchinson. (KEK)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Veterans Affairs, filed by Matthew Hutchinson.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchinson v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Matthew Hutchinson
Represented By: Joshua I. Kahn
Represented By: David I Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?