Stearman et al v. Vesper Tuscaloosa LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tristan Stearman and Phillip C Stearman
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Vesper Tuscaloosa LLC, Trans Union LLC and ProCollect Inc
Case Number: 7:2019cv01202
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vesper Tuscaloosa LLC. filed by Vesper Tuscaloosa LLC (Tindal, Clay)
September 19, 2019 Filing 20 Vesper Tuscaloosa, LLC's ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Vesper Tuscaloosa LLC.(Tindal, Clay)
September 19, 2019 Filing 19 Procollect Amended ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by ProCollect Inc.(Yearout, Jason)
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Robinett, Matthew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC. filed by Equifax Information Services LLC (Reid, Kirkland)
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Reid, Kirkland)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Phillip C Stearman, Tristan Stearman.(Underwood, Earl)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 9/3/2019. (LAS2)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Phillip C Stearman, Tristan Stearman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Underwood, Earl)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Before this Court is Trans Union LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #5 ,Equifax Information Service LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #7 , and Vesper Tuscaloosa, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #9 . The Court finds that responses to the Plaintiff's Complaint are due by September 13, 2019. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/28/2019. (PSM)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ProCollect Inc. filed by ProCollect Inc (Yearout, Jason)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ProCollect Inc.(Yearout, Jason)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Vesper Tuscaloosa, LLC to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Vesper Tuscaloosa LLC. (Tindal, Clay)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/22/2019. (PSM)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Reid, Kirkland)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC. filed by Trans Union LLC (Robinett, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robinett, Matthew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip C Stearman, Tristan Stearman. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (JLC)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip C Stearman, Tristan Stearman. ProCollect Inc served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (JLC)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, ProCollect Inc, Trans Union LLC, Vesper Tuscaloosa LLC. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC, ProCollect Inc, Trans Union LLC, Vesper Tuscaloosa LLC (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Phillip C Stearman, Tristan Stearman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stearman et al v. Vesper Tuscaloosa LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Kirkland E Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vesper Tuscaloosa LLC
Represented By: Troy Ted Tindal
Represented By: Clay A Tindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Matthew Robinett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProCollect Inc
Represented By: Jason L Yearout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristan Stearman
Represented By: Earl P Underwood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip C Stearman
Represented By: Earl P Underwood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?