Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Locke et al
Plaintiff: Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: North Mississippi Medical Center Inc, Air Evac EMS Inc, Relias Emergency Medicine Specialists of Fayette LLC, Medpay Assurance LLC, Bluecross Blue Shield of Alabama, United States, The, Northstar EMS Inc, Dale Locke and Surgery Associates PA
Case Number: 7:2019cv01570
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Relias Emergency Medicine Specialists of Fayette LLC served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt - Relias Emergency Medicine Specialists of Fayette, LLC)(Sherman, Colin)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Medpay Assurance LLC served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt - MedPay Assurance, LLC)(Sherman, Colin)
November 4, 2019 Removed Doc 9- "SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. United States, The served on 10/31/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Sherman, Colin)" - 1 return from 1 agency. To be filed again when all returns are received by plaintiff (MRR, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Northstar EMS Inc served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Sherman, Colin)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Bluecross Blue Shield of Alabama served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Sherman, Colin)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Air Evac EMS Inc served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Sherman, Colin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dale Locke. Dale Locke waiver sent on 10/21/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Langley, Charles)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States, The, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, returned to pltf (in SASE) for service (MRR, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Air Evac EMS Inc, Bluecross Blue Shield of Alabama, Dale Locke, Medpay Assurance LLC, North Mississippi Medical Center Inc, Northstar EMS Inc, Relias Emergency Medicine Specialists of Fayette LLC, Surgery Associates PA., returned to pltf (in SASE) for service (MRR, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 24, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3440265 (B4601100781). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ). (Sherman, Colin) Modified on 9/24/2019 (MRR, ).
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Locke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Colin D Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Mississippi Medical Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Evac EMS Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Relias Emergency Medicine Specialists of Fayette LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medpay Assurance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluecross Blue Shield of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar EMS Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surgery Associates PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?