Dunn v. Poe et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe #4 and Megan Dunn
Defendant: Deborah Johnson, Gilbert Jean, JC Poe, Jr, Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation, Dr Marcus O'Mary and Roger Wilson
Case Number: 7:2019cv01571
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/29/2019. (PSM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 J.C. Poe, Jr., and Deborah Johnson's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Deborah Johnson.(Donahue, Timothy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 Dr. Marcus O'Mary, Roger Wilson and Gilbert Jean's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Gilbert Jean.(Donahue, Timothy)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Megan Dunn. Deborah Johnson served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019; JC Poe, Jr served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (AKD)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #9 Summons Issued Notice of Service of Summons and Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Megan Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Allen, Andrew)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Deborah Johnson, and JC Poe, Jr. mailed certified mail (AKD)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Gilbert Jean, Marcus O'Mary and Roger Wilson, returned to Plaintiff for service on this the 15th day of October, 2019. (JLC)
October 15, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3456904, NDAL receipt #B4601101316.(Allen, Andrew) Modified on 10/16/2019 (JLC).
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 Request for service by certified mail filed by Megan Dunn. (Allen, Andrew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by Megan Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 - Part One, #7 Exhibit 6 - Part 2)(Allen, Andrew)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. #5 Themotion #5 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is directed to file her First AmendedComplaint as a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/11/2019. (PSM)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Jane Doe #4. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2, #4 Appendix 3, #5 Appendix 4, #6 Appendix 5, #7 Appendix 6 - Part 1, #8 Appendix 6 - Part 2)(Allen, Andrew)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Before the Court is Defendant Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation'sMotion to Require Jane Doe #4 to Reveal Her Identity. #2 For the reasonsstated in #9 of Bridges v. Poe et al., 7:19-cv-00529-LSC, Plaintiff is not entitled to proceed anonymously in this action, and Defendant's motion #2 is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff has eleven (11) days from the date of this Order to file an amended pleading identifying herself, or her action will be dismissed. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/3/2019. (PSM)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly S DeShazo on behalf of Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation (DeShazo, Kimberly)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION S MOTION TO REQUIRE JANE DOE #4 TO REVEAL HER IDENTITY by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. (Speagle, Scott)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation, Gilbert Jean, Deborah Johnson, Marcus O'Mary, JC Poe, Jr, Roger Wilson, filed by Jane Doe #4. (Attachments: #1 Attachment #1, #2 Attachment #2, #3 Attachment #3, #4 Attachment #4, #5 Attachment #5)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Poe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe #4
Represented By: Michele Elaine Pate
Represented By: James Franklin Ozment
Represented By: Andrew C Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Dunn
Represented By: Michele Elaine Pate
Represented By: James Franklin Ozment
Represented By: Andrew C Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Johnson
Represented By: Brian Jefferson Ware
Represented By: Timothy P Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Jean
Represented By: Brian Jefferson Ware
Represented By: Timothy P Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JC Poe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Scott M Speagle
Represented By: Kimberly S DeShazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Marcus O'Mary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?