Genesis Utility Communication Inc v. Western Surety Company
Plaintiff: Genesis Utility Communication Inc
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv01608
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Western Surety Company.(Hammond, Clark)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 11/15/2019. (PSM)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Western Surety Company's response to Plaintiff's complaint is due by 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 11/15/2019. (LAS2)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Western Surety Company. (Hammond, Clark)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben Bainbridge Robinson on behalf of Western Surety Company (Robinson, Ben)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Clark R Hammond on behalf of Western Surety Company (Hammond, Clark)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Genesis Utility Communication Inc. Western Surety Company served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019 (no date on green card). (AKD)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Western Surety Company mailed certified mail (KAM)
October 3, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3448323, NDAL receipt #B4601101026. (Williams, Justin) Modified on 10/3/2019 (JLC).
October 3, 2019 Request for service by certified mail filed by Genesis Utility Communication Inc., as stated in complaint #1 . (PSM)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Western Surety Company, filed by Genesis Utility Communication Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genesis Utility Communication Inc v. Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genesis Utility Communication Inc
Represented By: Justin G Williams
Represented By: Jonathan David Guin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Clark R Hammond
Represented By: Ben Bainbridge Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?