Hill et al v. CAG2 of Tuscaloosa LLC
Plaintiff: Leon Hill and Debra Hill
Defendant: CAG2 of Tuscaloosa LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv02044
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Before this Court is Defendant CAG2 of Tuscaloosa, LLC's Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award. #11 Plaintiffs have ten (10) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motion. Defendant will thereafter have five (5) days to file a reply. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/13/2020. (PSM)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Vacate ARBITRATION AWARD by CAG2 of Tuscaloosa LLC. (Cox, Joseph)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Chief Judge L. Scott Coogler on 1/27/2020. (LAS2)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 1/27/2020. (PSM)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Petition by CAG2 of Tuscaloosa LLC. (Cox, Joseph)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Chief Judge L. Scott Coogler on 1/27/2020. (LAS2)
January 23, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3520768 (ALND receipt# B4601103546). (Cox, Joseph) Modified on 1/23/2020 (AKD).
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James D. Duckworth by CAG2 of Tuscaloosa LLC. (Cox, Joseph)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T Cox, III on behalf of CAG2 of Tuscaloosa LLC (Cox, Joseph)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leon Hill, Debra Hill. CAG2 of Tuscaloosa LLC served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement USPS tracking data)(Donald, Thomas)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CAG2 of Tuscaloosa LLC, delivered to plaintiff for service. (AKD)
January 6, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601103093 (AKD)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CAG2 of Tuscaloosa LLC, filed by Leon Hill, Debra Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration dispute-Complaint, #2 Exhibit arbitration exhibit, #3 Exhibit AAA letter commencing arbitration, #4 Exhibit AAA letter upon completion arbitration, #5 Exhibit Arbitration Award)(Donald, Thomas)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAG2 of Tuscaloosa LLC, filed by Leon Hill, Debra Hill. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et al v. CAG2 of Tuscaloosa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAG2 of Tuscaloosa LLC
Represented By: James D Duckworth
Represented By: Joseph T Cox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Hill
Represented By: Michael Parrish
Represented By: Thomas C. Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Hill
Represented By: Michael Parrish
Represented By: Thomas C. Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?