Taylor v. CR Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Rosato D Taylor
Defendant: CR Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Case Number: 7:2020cv00460
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 6/2/2020. (LAS2)
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Daly, Taylor)
May 27, 2020 PHV Fee paid paid for Michael Gallant in the amount of $75.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3597263, NDAL receipt #B4601106141. (VanDerVeer, Nathan) Modified on 5/27/2020 (JLC).
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael Gallant by Rosato D Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(VanDerVeer, Nathan)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear and granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 5/5/2020. (LAS2)
May 5, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3583840 (ALND reciept# B4601105740). (Morris, George) Modified on 5/5/2020 (AKD).
May 5, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3583838 (ALND reciept# B4601105739). (Morris, George) Modified on 5/5/2020 (AKD).
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brandee J. Kowalzyk by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Brandee Kowalzyk)(Morris, George)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Taylor T. Daly by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Taylor Daly)(Morris, George)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/30/2020. (PSM)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc (Maughan, Diane)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc.(Maughan, Diane)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. returned to Plaintiff for service on this the 8th day of April 2020. (JLC)
April 6, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3568409 (ALND receipt# B4601105222). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, filed by Rosato D Taylor.(PSM). (VanDerVeer, Nathan) Modified on 4/7/2020 (AKD).
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, filed by Rosato D Taylor.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. CR Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard Inc
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosato D Taylor
Represented By: Nathan C VanDerVeer
Represented By: Michael L Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?