Poores v. Brantley
Plaintiff: Clinton Lee Poores
Defendant: Kristopher Brantley
Case Number: 7:2020cv00667
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Court having received the prisoner's signed #4 Prisoner Consent Form, the Warden is hereby directed to withdraw from Prison Account of Clinton Lee Poores any deposits made by or on behalf of the plaintiff into any inmate account at the facility to satisfy the docket fee required by the filing of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/1/2020. (JLC)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of signed Prisoner Consent Form by Clinton Lee Poores. (JLC)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court concludes that Plaintiff is not capable of paying an Initial Partial Filing Fee. However, if he wishes to proceeds with this action, Plaintiff shall remain obligated to pay the full filing fee to be deducted from his prison or jail trust account. Plaintiff is also required to sign and return the attached Prisoner Consent Form within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order or the complaint will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 5/14/2020. (JLC)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clinton Lee Poores. (KEK)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kristopher Brantley, filed by Clinton Lee Poores.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poores v. Brantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Lee Poores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher Brantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?