Gamble v. First Transit
Plaintiff: Robbie Gamble
Defendant: First Transit
Case Number: 7:2020cv00686
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Before this Court is Defendant First Transit's Motion to Dismiss. #16 Plaintiff has fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motion. Defendant will thereafter have ten (10) days to file a reply. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/9/2020. (PSM)
July 8, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by First Transit. (Weinert, Katherine)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/2/2020. (PSM)
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable L. Scott Coogler; Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. The telephone conference set for 7/62020 at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELLED (KAM)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled at 10:00 AM on Monday, July 6, 2020; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be canceled (ASL)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Due to the filing of the #10 Amended Complaint, Defendant First Transit's #6 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/25/2020. (KMAW)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robbie Gamble. (Jones, Albert)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robbie Gamble, filed by Robbie Gamble.(Jones, Albert)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 27, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 27, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on July 6, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 866-390-1828 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 9262283. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/12/20. (MRR, )
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Now pending is #6 Defendant First Transit's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion on or before 6/26/2020, and Defendant shall file a reply on or before 7/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/12/2020. (KMAW)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Transit. filed by First Transit (Bashinski, Hayden)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by First Transit. (Weinert, Katherine)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robbie Gamble. First Transit served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (AKD)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to First Transit Inc. mailed certified mail. (AKD)
May 18, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3592347 (B4601106013). related document #1 COMPLAINT against First Transit, filed by Robbie Gamble.(MRR, ). (Jones, Albert) Modified on 5/18/2020 (MRR, ).
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Robbie Gamble. (MRR, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Transit, filed by Robbie Gamble.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamble v. First Transit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Gamble
Represented By: Albert Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Transit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?