Jennings v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Cleveland Jennings
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 7:2020cv00716
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cleveland Jennings. (Coplin, William)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cleveland Jennings. (Coplin, William)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cleveland Jennings. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 6/2/2020, answer due 8/1/2020. (Coplin, William)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
May 21, 2020 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3594907, NDAL receipt #B4601106091. (Coplin, William) Modified on 5/21/2020 (JLC).
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against the Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Cleveland Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland Jennings
Represented By: William T Coplin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?