Combs v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Phillip J Combs
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 7:2020cv00933
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 7/21/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (BJL)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by You-Jin Han on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Han, You-Jin)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General by Clerk for service via USMS. (BJL)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/2/20. (BJL)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 7/2/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Phillip J Combs. (KEK)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Phillip J Combs.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Combs v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Represented By: You-Jin Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip J Combs
Represented By: Richard D Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?