Heravi et al v. Country Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Heravi and Amir Heravi
Defendant: Michael Watkins, CRDN of Birmingham and Country Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2020cv01054
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Brittain, W)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. #7 Plaintiffs assert that the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this action because defendants CRDN of Birmingham and Michael Watkins are not fraudulently joined, therefore the parties lack complete diversity. Defendants are hereby ORDERED to show cause as to why Plaintiffs' motion should not be granted. Defendants' submission should not exceed fifteen (15) double-spaced pages and is due ten (10) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/31/2020. (PSM)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 08/28/2020. (LSB)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Amir Heravi, Lisa Heravi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Glover, R)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Amir Heravi, Lisa Heravi. (Glover, R)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by CRDN of Birmingham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E", #6 Exhibit "F", #7 Exhibit "G", #8 Exhibit "H", #9 Exhibit "I", #10 Exhibit "J")(Morano, H)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Country Mutual Insurance Company. filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company (Brittain, W)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Country Mutual Insurance Company.(Brittain, W)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/27/2020. (PSM)
July 24, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3636262. (R# B4601107354) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Country Mutual Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa, Alabama, case number 63-cv-2020-900595, filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 01 - Index, # 2 02 - Complaint, # 3 03 - State Court Filings, # 4 04 - Case Action Summary, # 5 05 - NAIC Company Lookup Summary, # 6 06 - Certified Copy of Policy, # 7 07 - Authorization, # 8 08 - Estimate)(KEK). (Brittain, W)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Country Mutual Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa, Alabama, case number 63-cv-2020-900595, filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 01 - Index, #2 02 - Complaint, #3 03 - State Court Filings, #4 04 - Case Action Summary, #5 05 - NAIC Company Lookup Summary, #6 06 - Certified Copy of Policy, #7 07 - Authorization, #8 08 - Estimate)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heravi et al v. Country Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRDN of Birmingham
Represented By: H Spence Morano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: W Evans Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Heravi
Represented By: P Ted Colquett
Represented By: R Matt Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amir Heravi
Represented By: P Ted Colquett
Represented By: R Matt Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?