LaBrake et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Kevin LaBrake, April LaBrake and Megan Townsend
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2020cv01430
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Burke on behalf of Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company (Burke, Emily)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 11/23/2020. (PSM)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 11/23/2020. (LSB)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleading by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company. (Little, John)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin LaBrake, Megan Townsend, April LaBrake. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (MEB2)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin LaBrake, Megan Townsend, April LaBrake. Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (MEB2)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by April LaBrake, Kevin LaBrake, Megan Townsend re #1 Complaint Exhibits (Cockrell, Bobby)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by April LaBrake, Kevin LaBrake, Megan Townsend. (Cockrell, Bobby)
September 25, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3679628 (B4601108658). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Kevin LaBrake, Megan Townsend, April LaBrake.(PSM). (Cockrell, Bobby) Modified on 9/25/2020 (MEB2).
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Kevin LaBrake, Megan Townsend, April LaBrake.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaBrake et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin LaBrake
Represented By: Bobby H Cockrell, Jr
Represented By: Jonathan David Townsend
Represented By: Gregory Scotch Ritchey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April LaBrake
Represented By: Bobby H Cockrell, Jr
Represented By: Jonathan David Townsend
Represented By: Gregory Scotch Ritchey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Townsend
Represented By: Bobby H Cockrell, Jr
Represented By: Jonathan David Townsend
Represented By: Gregory Scotch Ritchey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?