Doe #1 et al v. MG Freesites LTD et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe #1 and Jane Doe #2
Defendant: 9219-1568 Quebec Inc a foreign entity doing business as Mindgeek, Mindgeek USA Incorporated, MG Freesites II LTD, Mindgeek Content RT Limited, MG Billing LTD, Mindgeek S.A.R.L., MG Freesites LTD a foreign entity doing business as Pornhub and MG CY Holdings LTD
Case Number: 7:2021cv00220
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on March 22, 2021. (ABN)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS- with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 3/19/2021. (PSM)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time For Defendants to File Responsive Pleading Pursuant to Agreement and Defendants' Waiver of Service of the Summons by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Given the foregoing, Plaintiffs' "Motion for Leave to Proceed Pseudonymously" #2 is hereby GRANTED without prejudice to the right of Defendants to respond if they feel necessary to do so after being served. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 3/3/2021. (PSM)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on March 1, 2021. (ABN)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on March 1, 2021. (ABN)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Louis C. Bechtle)(Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3784711 (B4601111680). (Zarzaur, Gregory) Modified on 2/25/2021 (MRR, ).
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kimberly Lambert Adams, #2 Affidavit Brian Dooley Kent, #3 Affidavit Gaetano Anthony DAndrea, #4 Affidavit Jillian Patricia Roth, #5 Affidavit M. Stewart Ryan, #6 Affidavit Alexandria MacMaster, #7 Affidavit Benjamin W. Bull, #8 Affidavit Peter A. Gentala, #9 Affidavit Danielle Bianculli Pinter, #10 Affidavit Christen M. Price, #11 Affidavit Kevin D. Kent, #12 Affidavit Mark B. Schoeller, #13 Affidavit Joseph W. Jesiolowski)(Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Protective Order PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3782427. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3782428. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3782426. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3782424. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3782419. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3782417. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3782416. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3782414. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3782425. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3782420. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3782421. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3782423. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3782422. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3775411 (B4601111450). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2.(PSM). (Zarzaur, Gregory) Modified on 2/12/2021 (MEB2).
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2.(PSM) (PSM, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe #1 et al v. MG Freesites LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9219-1568 Quebec Inc a foreign entity doing business as Mindgeek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mindgeek USA Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MG Freesites II LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mindgeek Content RT Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MG Billing LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mindgeek S.A.R.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MG Freesites LTD a foreign entity doing business as Pornhub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MG CY Holdings LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe #1
Represented By: Gregory M Zarzaur
Represented By: Joshua Patrick Hayes
Represented By: Christen M. Price
Represented By: Gaetano Anthony D'Andrea
Represented By: Alexandria MacMaster
Represented By: Joseph W Jesiolowski
Represented By: Brian Dooley Kent
Represented By: Mark B Schoeller
Represented By: Benjamin W Bull
Represented By: Kimberly L Adams
Represented By: Jillian Patricia Roth
Represented By: Peter A. Gentala
Represented By: M Stewart Ryan
Represented By: Kevin D Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe #2
Represented By: Gregory M Zarzaur
Represented By: Joshua Patrick Hayes
Represented By: Christen M. Price
Represented By: Gaetano Anthony D'Andrea
Represented By: Alexandria MacMaster
Represented By: Joseph W Jesiolowski
Represented By: Brian Dooley Kent
Represented By: Mark B Schoeller
Represented By: Benjamin W Bull
Represented By: Kimberly L Adams
Represented By: Jillian Patricia Roth
Represented By: Peter A. Gentala
Represented By: M Stewart Ryan
Represented By: Kevin D Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?