Anderson v. Mollertech USA LLC
Plaintiff: Jennifer Anderson
Defendant: Mollertech USA LLC
Case Number: 7:2021cv00285
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/24/2021. (KAM)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 MollerTech USA, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mollertech USA LLC.(Redmond, Wesley)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Anderson. Mollertech USA LLC served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Crampton, Courtney)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mollertech USA LLC. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
February 26, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3786079 (ALND B4601111720) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Mollertech USA LLC, filed by Jennifer Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KAM). (Crampton, Courtney) Modified on 2/26/2021 (KEK).
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mollertech USA LLC, filed by Jennifer Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Mollertech USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mollertech USA LLC
Represented By: Susan W Bullock
Represented By: Wesley C Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Anderson
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Wrady
Represented By: Courtney Brooks Crampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?