West Virginia, State of et al v. United States Department of the Treasury et al
Plaintiff: West Virginia, State of, Utah, State of, Oklahoma, State of, Alabama, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Alaska, State of, Kansas, State of, Arkansas, State of, New Hampshire, State of, Florida, State of, Montana, State of and Iowa, State of
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury, Richard K Delmar and Janet Yellen
Amicus Curiae: Mo Brooks, A. Drew Ferguson, IV, Ronny L. Jackson, Kevin McCarthy, Tom Reed, Ron Estes, Adrian Smith, Diana Harshbarger, Pete Sessions, Michael Waltz, John Barrasso, Kevin Brady, Lloyd Smucker, National Taxpayers Union Foundation, John Cornyn, Ted Cruz, Gus M. Bilirakis, Dan Bishop, Lance Gooden, Ted Budd, Lauren Boebert, W. Gregory Steube, Ben Cline, Ben Sasse, Warren Davidson, Michelle Steel, Earl L. Carter, Andy Biggs, Bill Hagerty, Mike Rogers, Rick Scott, Vicky Hartzler, Claudia Tenney, James E. Risch, Michael Guest, Guy Reschenthaler, Brad Wenstrup, Robert Aderholt, David Schweikert, Jeff Duncan, Mike Kelly, The Buckeye Institute, Carol D. Miller, D.D.S. Paul A. Gosar, Ann Wagner, Ashley Hinson, Rick W. Allen, Mike Crapo, Barry Moore, Scott Fitzgerald, Kevin Hern, Jackie Walorski, Jim Banks, Tom Rice, John Boozman, Devin Nunes, David Rouzer, Todd Young, Chamber of Commerce of the United States, Marsha Blackburn, The New Civil Liberties Alliance, James Inhofe, American Center for Law and Justice, Randy Weber, Yvette Herrell, Louie Gohmert, Mike Garcia, Jason Smith, Glenn Grothman, Vern Buchanan, Mike Braun, Darin LaHood, Bob Good, Tim Scott, Rob Portman, Shelley Moore Capito, James Lankford, Kevin Cramer, Steve Daines, James Comer, Scott Perry, Roger Marshall and Tom McClintock
Intervenor Plaintiff: Wisconsin Legislature
Case Number: 7:2021cv00465
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum In Support Of The Motion filed by Richard K Delmar, United States Department of the Treasury, Janet Yellen. (Clendenen, Michael)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TEXT ORDER: Misha Tseytlin and Sean T.H. Dutton have moved for leave to appear pro hac vice #63 #64 . Their motions are GRANTED. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/27/2021. (MEB2)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Consent MOTION to Stay Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Richard K Delmar, United States Department of the Treasury, Janet Yellen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clendenen, Michael)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3843654 (ALND receipt #B4601113483). (Shaner, John) Modified on 5/20/2021 (MEB2).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sean T.H. Dutton by Wisconsin Legislature. (Shaner, John)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3843644 (ALND receipt #B4601113482). (Shaner, John) Modified on 5/20/2021 (MEB2).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Misha Tseytlin by Wisconsin Legislature. (Shaner, John)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE by Alabama, State of re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of the Motion Joint Notice re Parties' Negotiations and Possible Hearing (LaCour, Edmund)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER The Wisconsin Legislature "move[d] to intervene in this matter." ( #58 at 2.) The defendants have ten (10) days from this Order's entry to show cause andexplain why the Court should not grant this motion. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/19/2021. (PSM)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TEXT ORDER: Anthony J. Galdieri moved for leave to appear pro hac vice #53 . His motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/17/2021. (PSM)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Alabama, State of re: #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of the Motion filed by Alabama, State of. (LaCour, Edmund)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum In Support Of The Motion by Wisconsin Legislature. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Complaint In Intervention, #2 Exhibit B Proposed Motion To Join Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction)(Shaner, John)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE by Richard K Delmar, United States Department of the Treasury, Janet Yellen of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: S.D. Ohio Opinion)(Ehrlich, Stephen)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE by Richard K Delmar, United States Department of the Treasury, Janet Yellen of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E.D. Mo. Decision)(Roberts, Charles)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE by Richard K Delmar, United States Department of the Treasury, Janet Yellen of Interim Final Rule (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Interim Final Rule)(Roberts, Charles)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of the Motion filed by Richard K Delmar, United States Department of the Treasury, Janet Yellen. (Ehrlich, Stephen)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION in Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by New Hampshire, State of. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration in Support of PHV Request)(Galdieri, Anthony)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3835327 (ALND receipt #B4601113209). (Galdieri, Anthony) Modified on 5/7/2021 (MEB2).
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ORDER: The pending Motions for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Briefs #41 #43 #44 #48 are GRANTED. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/7/2021. (KEK)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER: Margaret A. Little moved for leave to appear pro hac vice #40 . Her motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/7/2021. (KEK)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Jackson on behalf of Robert Aderholt, Rick W. Allen, American Center for Law and Justice, Jim Banks, John Barrasso, Andy Biggs, Gus M. Bilirakis, Dan Bishop, Marsha Blackburn, Lauren Boebert, John Boozman, Kevin Brady, Mike Braun, Mo Brooks, Vern Buchanan, Ted Budd, Shelley Moore Capito, Earl L. Carter, Ben Cline, James Comer, John Cornyn, Kevin Cramer, Mike Crapo, Ted Cruz, Steve Daines, Warren Davidson, Jeff Duncan, Ron Estes, A. Drew Ferguson, IV, Scott Fitzgerald, Mike Garcia, Louie Gohmert, Bob Good, Lance Gooden, Paul A. Gosar, Glenn Grothman, Michael Guest, Bill Hagerty, Diana Harshbarger, Vicky Hartzler, Kevin Hern, Yvette Herrell, Ashley Hinson, James Inhofe, Ronny L. Jackson, Mike Kelly, Darin LaHood, James Lankford, Roger Marshall, Kevin McCarthy, Tom McClintock, Carol D. Miller, Barry Moore, Devin Nunes, Scott Perry, Rob Portman, Tom Reed, Guy Reschenthaler, Tom Rice, James E. Risch, Mike Rogers, David Rouzer, Ben Sasse, David Schweikert, Rick Scott, Tim Scott, Pete Sessions, Adrian Smith, Jason Smith, Lloyd Smucker, Michelle Steel, W. Gregory Steube, Claudia Tenney, Ann Wagner, Jackie Walorski, Michael Waltz, Randy Weber, Brad Wenstrup, Todd Young (Jackson, Michael)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE by Richard K Delmar, United States Department of the Treasury, Janet Yellen (Joint) (Clendenen, Michael)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff States by The New Civil Liberties Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief for Amicus Curiae)(Ayers, Marc)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J Ayers on behalf of The New Civil Liberties Alliance (Ayers, Marc)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Henchman on behalf of National Taxpayers Union Foundation (Henchman, Joseph)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Kasdin Miller Mitchell on behalf of Chamber of Commerce of the United States (Mitchell, Kasdin)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Chamber of Commerce of the United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief)(Mitchell, Kasdin)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3830593. (Ayers, Marc)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by National Taxpayers Union Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amicus Curiae National Taxpayers Union Foundation in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Henchman, Joseph)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Brief re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of the Motion Amici Curiae Brief of Seventy-Eight (78) Members of the U.S. Senate and U.S. House of Representatives and the American Center for Law and Justice in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mike Crapo, Tim Scott, John Barrasso, Marsha Blackburn, John Boozman, Mike Braun, Shelley Moore Capito, John Cornyn, Kevin Cramer, Ted Cruz, Steve Daines, Bill Hagerty, James Inhofe, James Lankford, Roger Marshall, Rob Portman, James E. Risch, Ben Sasse, Rick Scott, Todd Young, Jim Banks, Kevin Brady, Robert Aderholt, Rick W. Allen, Andy Biggs, Gus M. Bilirakis, Dan Bishop, Lauren Boebert, Mo Brooks, Vern Buchanan, Ted Budd, Earl L. Carter, Ben Cline, James Comer, Warren Davidson, Jeff Duncan, Ron Estes, A. Drew Ferguson, IV, Scott Fitzgerald, Mike Garcia, Louie Gohmert, Bob Good, Lance Gooden, Paul A. Gosar, Glenn Grothman, Michael Guest, Diana Harshbarger, Vicky Hartzler, Kevin Hern, Yvette Herrell, Ashley Hinson, Ronny L. Jackson, Mike Kelly, Darin LaHood, Kevin McCarthy, Tom McClintock, Carol D. Miller, Barry Moore, Devin Nunes, Scott Perry, Tom Reed, Guy Reschenthaler, Tom Rice, Mike Rogers, David Rouzer, David Schweikert, Pete Sessions, Adrian Smith, Jason Smith, Lloyd Smucker, Michelle Steel, W. Gregory Steube, Claudia Tenney, Ann Wagner, Jackie Walorski, Michael Waltz, Randy Weber, Brad Wenstrup, American Center for Law and Justice. (Jackson, Michael)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff States by The Buckeye Institute. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amicus Curiae The Buckeye Institute)(Weller, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2021: #1 Exhibit 1) (PSM, ).
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2021. (PSM)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Joseph D. Henchman has moved for leave to appear pro hac vice #37 . His motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/30/2021. (PSM)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Margaret A. Little by The New Civil Liberties Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Admissions, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Marc James Ayers)(Ayers, Marc)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W Weller on behalf of The Buckeye Institute (Weller, Christopher)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3827987 (NDAL receipt #B4601112953). (Henchman, Joseph) Modified on 4/28/2021 (MEB2).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by David I Schoen on behalf of National Taxpayers Union Foundation (Schoen, David)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Proposed Amicus National Taxpayers Union Foundation by National Taxpayers Union Foundation. (Henchman, Joseph)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ORDER: Paul D. Clement, Jeffrey Scott Thompson, and Andrew M. Grossman have moved for leave to appear pro hac vice #31 #32 #35 . Their motions are GRANTED. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/27/2021. (PSM)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3827659 (NDAL receipt #B4601112943). (Weller, Christopher) Modified on 4/27/2021 (MEB2).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew M. Grossman by The Buckeye Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Admissions, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Christopher W. Weller)(Weller, Christopher)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Clendenen on behalf of Richard K Delmar, United States Department of the Treasury, Janet Yellen (Clendenen, Michael)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER The Court entered a briefing schedule on 04/23/21. 30 This Order supplements those directives. First, the defendants' response to the plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall not exceed forty-three (43) double-spaced pages. Second, no amicus brief shall exceed thirty (30) double- paced pages. The Court encourages amici to work together to file joint briefs. Third, and as explained in the previously entered briefing schedule, all submissions must be in 14-point type, except footnotes may be in 12-point ype. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/27/2021. (PSM)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Iowa, State of. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Bryan Taylor)(Thompson, Jeffrey)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3825676 (ALND receipt #B4601112877). (Thompson, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/26/2021 (MEB2).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3825022 (ALND receipt #B4601112851). (Mitchell, Kasdin) Modified on 4/23/2021 (MEB2).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul D. Clement by Chamber of Commerce of the United States. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Additional Courts)(Mitchell, Kasdin)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER: The Joint Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule #28 is GRANTED. All amicus briefs in support of the plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction are due by 04/30/2021. The defendants' response to the plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by 05/07/2021. All amicus briefs in support of the defendants' response are due by 05/07/21. The plaintiffs' reply brief is due by 05/14/2021. All submissions must be in 14-point type, except footnotes may be in 12-point type. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/23/2021. (PSM)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call 877-336-1828 and use Access Code 3967498 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference. (PSM)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E T Roberts on behalf of All Defendants (Roberts, Charles)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule by Richard K Delmar, United States Department of the Treasury, Janet Yellen. (Ehrlich, Stephen)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601112723 as to Jeffery John Tronvold (PSM)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Ehrlich on behalf of All Defendants (Ehrlich, Stephen)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER: David M.S. Dewhirst and Mithun Suresh Mansinghani have moved for leave to appear pro hac vice #24 #25 . Their motions are GRANTED. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/19/2021. (PSM)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3819727 (B4601112739). (Mansinghani, Mithun) Modified on 4/15/2021 (MEB2).
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Limited Admission to appear Pro Hac Vice by Oklahoma, State of. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Local Counsel)(Mansinghani, Mithun)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3819402 (B4601112723). (Dewhirst, David) Modified on 4/15/2021 (MEB2).
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Montana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Dewhirst, David)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This action has been reassigned to Judge L Scott Coogler. Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3818835(NDAL rec# B4601112721). (Ptacin, John) Modified on 4/15/2021 (MEB2).
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to reassign this case to a district jujdge randomly drawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 4/14/2021. (KAM)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of the Motion by Alabama, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LaCour, Edmund)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3816401. (Hilborn, Jason) NDAL rec# B4601112627.
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3816384. (Holyoak, Melissa) NDAL rec# B4601112626.
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: Before the court is the #19 motion to allow Melissa A. Holyoak to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff the State of Utah. The motion, which includes the information required under the Local Rules, is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED, subject to the payment of the applicable fee within seven calendar days. Upon receipt of the required fee, this conditional grant of pro hac vice status will become final without further court action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 04/12/2021. (SUH)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Plaintiff State of Utah by Utah, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Bryan M. Taylor, #2 Exhibit 2-Certificate of Good Standing-US District Court for the District of Utah)(Holyoak, Melissa)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: Before the court is the #17 motion to allow Jason Harrison Hilborn to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff the State of Florida. The motion, which includes the information required under the Local Rules, is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED, subject to the payment of the applicable fee within seven calendar days. Upon receipt of the required fee, this conditional grant of pro hac vice status will become final without further court action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 04/12/2021. (SUH)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Florida, State of. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hilborn, Jason)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Before the court is the #15 motion to allow Jeffery J. Tronvold to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff the State of South Dakota. The motion, which includes the information required under the Local Rules, is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED, subject to the payment of the applicable fee within seven calendar days. Upon receipt of the required fee, this conditional grant of pro hac vice status will become final without further court action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 04/08/2021. (SUH)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of South Dakota by South Dakota, State of. (Tronvold, Jeffery)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Before the court is the #4 motion to allow John Michael Ptacin to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff the State of Alaska. The motion, which includes the information required under the Local Rules, is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED, subject to the payment of the applicable fee within seven calendar days. Upon receipt of the required fee, this conditional grant of pro hac vice status will become final without further court action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 04/08/2021. (SUH)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. The motions include the information required under the Local Rules and the docket sheet reflects payment of the applicable fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 04/08/2021. (SUH)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3814629. (Smith, James) NDAL rec # B461112544
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3814595. (Tryon, David) NDAL rec #B460112546.
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3814592. (See, Lindsay) NDAL rec# B4601112545.
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3814574. (Lee, Jessica) NDAL rec#B4601112547.
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3814533. (Jacobs, Dylan) NDAL rec# B4601112541 Modified on 4/8/2021 (KAM).
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arkansas, State of. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Jacobs, Dylan)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3814280. (Bronni, Nicholas) NDAL rec# B4601112534 Modified on 4/8/2021 (KAM).
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3814277. (Wagner, Vincent) NDAL rec# B461112533 Modified on 4/8/2021 (KAM).
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arkansas, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wagner, Vincent)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arkansas, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Bronni, Nicholas)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3813973. (Carswell, Dwight) NDAL rec# B4601112523
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kansas, State of. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bryan Taylor)(Carswell, Dwight)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by West Virginia, State of. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Tryon, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by West Virginia, State of. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lee, Jessica)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by West Virginia, State of. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(See, Lindsay)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by South Carolina, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Taylor)(Smith, James)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Plaintiff State of Alaska by Alaska, State of. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Taylor)(Ptacin, John)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Richard K Delmar, United States Department of the Treasury, Janet Yellen, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (MEB2)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on All Defendants on 4/1/2021, filed by Alabama, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USA Summons)(Harris, Andrew)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard K Delmar, United States Department of the Treasury, Janet Yellen, filed by Kansas, State of, Arkansas, State of, Utah, State of, Alabama, State of, West Virginia, State of, South Dakota, State of, New Hampshire, State of, Florida, State of, Montana, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, Alaska, State of, Iowa, State of. Filing fee paid $402.00 rec #B4601112390(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Virginia, State of et al v. United States Department of the Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia, State of
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: David Christian Tryon
Represented By: Jessica Anne Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah, State of
Represented By: Melissa A Holyoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma, State of
Represented By: Mithun Mansinghani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama, State of
Represented By: James W Davis
Represented By: Andrew Reid Harris
Represented By: Steven Troy Marshall
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour
Represented By: Bryan McDaniel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina, State of
Represented By: James Emory Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Dakota, State of
Represented By: Jeffery John Tronvold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska, State of
Represented By: John Ptacin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas, State of
Represented By: Dwight Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hampshire, State of
Represented By: Anthony J Galdieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida, State of
Represented By: Jason H. Hilborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana, State of
Represented By: David M.S. Dewhirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iowa, State of
Represented By: Jeffrey S Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Michael Patrick Clendenen
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Represented By: Charles E T Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard K Delmar
Represented By: Michael Patrick Clendenen
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Represented By: Charles E T Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Yellen
Represented By: Michael Patrick Clendenen
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Represented By: Charles E T Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mo Brooks
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: A. Drew Ferguson, IV
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ronny L. Jackson
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kevin McCarthy
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tom Reed
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ron Estes
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Adrian Smith
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Diana Harshbarger
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Pete Sessions
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Waltz
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John Barrasso
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kevin Brady
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lloyd Smucker
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Taxpayers Union Foundation
Represented By: Joseph Henchman
Represented By: David I Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John Cornyn
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ted Cruz
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gus M. Bilirakis
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dan Bishop
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lance Gooden
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ted Budd
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lauren Boebert
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: W. Gregory Steube
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ben Cline
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ben Sasse
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Warren Davidson
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michelle Steel
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Earl L. Carter
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Andy Biggs
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bill Hagerty
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mike Rogers
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rick Scott
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vicky Hartzler
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Claudia Tenney
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James E. Risch
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Guest
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Guy Reschenthaler
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brad Wenstrup
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert Aderholt
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Schweikert
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jeff Duncan
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mike Kelly
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Buckeye Institute
Represented By: Christopher W Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Carol D. Miller
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: D.D.S. Paul A. Gosar
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ann Wagner
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ashley Hinson
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rick W. Allen
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mike Crapo
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Barry Moore
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Scott Fitzgerald
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kevin Hern
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jackie Walorski
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jim Banks
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tom Rice
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John Boozman
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Devin Nunes
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Rouzer
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Todd Young
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States
Represented By: Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Marsha Blackburn
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The New Civil Liberties Alliance
Represented By: Marc J Ayers
Represented By: Margaret A Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James Inhofe
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Center for Law and Justice
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Randy Weber
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Yvette Herrell
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Louie Gohmert
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mike Garcia
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jason Smith
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Glenn Grothman
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vern Buchanan
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mike Braun
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Darin LaHood
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bob Good
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tim Scott
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rob Portman
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Shelley Moore Capito
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James Lankford
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kevin Cramer
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Steve Daines
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James Comer
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Scott Perry
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Roger Marshall
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tom McClintock
Represented By: Michael L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Wisconsin Legislature
Represented By: John Houston Shaner
Represented By: Sean T H Dutton
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?