Payne v. Camber Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ulysses Payne
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc doing business as Solco Helathcare LLC, Camber Pharmaceuticals Inc, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical, Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc, Torrent Pharma Inc, Torrent Pharmaceuticals Limited and Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc
Case Number: 7:2021cv00495
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 6/1/21. (MRR, )
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum Law in Support filed by Camber Pharmaceuticals Inc, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc, Torrent Pharma Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Parker, George)
April 27, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc (Parker, George)
April 27, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.(Parker, George)
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time and to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Ulysses Payne. (Brooks, Gerald)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER The plaintiff's Motion to Remand is before the Court #6 . The defendant has ten (10) days from this Order's entry to respond. The plaintiff will thereafter have seven (7) days to file a reply.The defendant's Motion to Stay is also before the Court #8 . This motion is DENIED. The Court retains jurisdiction to rule on the pending Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/19/2021. (PSM)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time and to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Camber Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Brannen, Franklin)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Ulysses Payne (Brooks, Gerald)
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum Law in Support by Ulysses Payne. (Brooks, Gerald)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Camber Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Camber Pharmaceuticals Inc (Brannen, Franklin)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc (Parker, George)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 Defendant Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.(Parker, George)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/7/2021. (PSM)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc from Circuit Court of Sumter County, case number 60-cv-2021-900022., filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(PSM)
April 7, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3814130 (B4601112525). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc from Circuit Court of Sumter County, case number 60-cv-2021-900022., filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (PSM). (Parker, George) Modified on 4/7/2021 (MEB2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Camber Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc doing business as Solco Helathcare LLC
Represented By: George R Parker
Represented By: F M Haston, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camber Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Franklin P Brannen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharmaceuticals Limited
Represented By: Reed Thomas Warburton
Represented By: Thomas Brooks Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc
Represented By: George R Parker
Represented By: F M Haston, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulysses Payne
Represented By: Tiffany Tolliver
Represented By: Gerald Clark Brooks, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?