English v. FCI SPC Aliceville et al
Petitioner: Tanya English
Respondent: FCI SPC Aliceville, Mr Williamson MLP, Ms. Neely, Garcia Camp, Mr. Sealy and Mr. Medley
Case Number: 7:2022cv01276
Filed: October 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 REPLY to re #5 Government's Response filed by Tanya English. (AKD)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER It is ORDERED that the petitioner must file a reply addressing the defense in the Answer within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/23/2022. (KSS)
November 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E Borton, IV on behalf of Ms. Neely (Borton, Thomas)
November 18, 2022 Filing 5 RESPONSE to re #3 Amended Habeas Petition filed by Ms. Neely. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Borton, Thomas)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-Accordingly, the respondent is ORDERED to appear and show cause in writing within 30 days why the petition should not be granted. In the response, the respondent must include a thorough discussion of all matters of fact and law relating to the petition, including any claim the petitioner must exhaust her administrative remedies and has not done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/24/2022. (AKD)
October 21, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Tanya English.(AKD)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER-The undersigned ORDERS English to notify the court within 21 days from the entry date of this order whether she wishes to continue with this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and correct the deficiencies identified herein or file a complaint pursuant to Bivens and name as defendants the individual prison officials she alleges violated her constitutional rights. If English fails to notify the court of her intentions within the allotted time, this action may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/04/2022. (AKD)
October 3, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Tanya English.(AKD)
October 3, 2022 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number B-1423 (AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: English v. FCI SPC Aliceville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tanya English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI SPC Aliceville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr Williamson MLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ms. Neely
Represented By: Thomas E Borton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Garcia Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr. Sealy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr. Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?