Britford v. Davis et al
Petitioner: Randy E Britford
Respondent: Gwendolyn Davis, Easterling Correctional Facility and Steve Marshall
Case Number: 7:2023cv00707
Filed: June 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court DENIES the #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and petitioner has 14 days to pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/28/2023. (AHI)
July 25, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randy E Britford. (AHI)
July 24, 2023 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Randy E Britford (AHI)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #6 Motion for Leave to File to Supplement the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/28/ 2023. (AHI)
June 22, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Supplement 28 U.S.C. Section 2254 Habeas Corpus by Randy E Britford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LCB)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court DENIES #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Petitioner is ORDERED to forward a check or money order to the Clerk of Court in the amount of $5 within 30 days. If petitioner does not comply by this deadline the court may dismiss this action as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/22/2023. (LCB)
June 12, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randy E Britford. (AHI)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The petitioner has 30 days to correct the deficient pleading. Failure to comply with this Court's order may result in this action being dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/7/2023. (AHI)
June 6, 2023 Filing 2 PRISONER CASE NUMBER NOTICE (AHI)
June 1, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Randy E Britford.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britford v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randy E Britford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gwendolyn Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Easterling Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?