Reagan v. Warden Kimberly Neely
Petitioner: Casondra Reagan
Respondent: Warden Kimberly Neely
Case Number: 7:2023cv01588
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Nicholas A Danella
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Warden Kimberly Neely. filed by Warden Kimberly Neely (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amendment to Sentence Monitoring Computation Data)(Walker, Darren)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The purpose of this order is to notify Petitioner Reagan that the court deems this case as ripe for summary disposition based on the defenses in the answer. See McBride v. Sharpe, 25 F.3d 962 (11th Cir. 1994). For this reason, Reagan is ORDERED to file a reply addressing the defenses in the answer within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 1/10/2024. (DNW)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: On January 9, 2024, Respondent filed a motion to seal an exhibit to the answer (Doc. 7-4) containing personally identifiable information. Doc. 8. For good cause shown, Respondent's motion (Doc. 8) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 1/10/2024. (DNW)
January 10, 2024 MOTION for Summary Judgment pursuant to Order #10 . (DNW)
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 First MOTION to Seal Document 7-4 by Warden Kimberly Neely. (Walker, Darren)
January 8, 2024 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Warden Kimberly Neely. filed by Warden Kimberly Neely (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment in a Criminal Case, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Amy Landers, #3 Exhibit FSA Time Credit Worksheet, #4 Exhibit Sentence Monitoring Computation Data, #5 Exhibit Sentence Monitoring Display Detainers, #6 Exhibit Administrative Remedies History, #7 Exhibit Judgment in a Criminal Case for Revocation of Supervised Release)(Walker, Darren)
January 8, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren Walker, Jr on behalf of Warden Kimberly Neely (Walker, Darren)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Respondent Neely is ORDERED to appear and show cause in writing, within 21 days, why Reagan's amended petition should not be granted. In the response, Respondent Neely must include a thorough discussion of all matters of fact and law relating to the amended petition, including any argument that the petitioner must exhaust her administrative remedies and has not done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 12/18/2023. (DNW)
December 18, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Casondra Reagan.(DNW)
December 14, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing by Casondra Reagan (DNW)
December 12, 2023 Filing fee received, receipt number B-9025 (DNW)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING: Petitioner Reagan must correct this deficiency within 30 days from the date of this notice. If Reagan fails to correct the deficient pleading in compliance with this notice within 30 days from the entry date of this notice, the court will dismiss this case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 11/30/2023. (DNW)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Casondra Reagan.(DNW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reagan v. Warden Kimberly Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Casondra Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Kimberly Neely
Represented By: Darren Walker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?