Alabama, State of et al v. Cardona et al
Plaintiff: Alabama, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, South Carolina, State of, Independent Women's Network, Parents Defending Education, Speech First, Inc and Independent Women's Law Center
Defendant: Miguel Cardona and U.S. Department of Education
Amicus Curiae: New Jersey, State of, California, State of, State of Pennsylvania and Stop Abusive and Violent Environments
Case Number: 7:2024cv00533
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act / Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Filing 40 Brief of Amicus Curiae STOP ABUSIVE AND VIOLENT ENVIRONMENTS. (Miller, Edward)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS the motion for leave to file an amicus brief. (Doc. #37 ). The amicus brief shall be filed on or before June 24, 2024. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/20/2024. (CLC)
June 19, 2024 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay Effective Date filed by Alabama, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Independent Women's Law Center, Independent Women's Network, Parents Defending Education, South Carolina, State of, Speech First, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Vaseliou Declaration, #2 Exhibit A: NWFSC TIX Policy, #3 Exhibit B: NWFSC Student Handbook, #4 Exhibit C: Comment by FIRE, #5 Exhibit D: FIRE Spotlight on Campus Due Process)(Norris, Cameron)
June 18, 2024 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Stop Abusive and Violent Environments. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief of Stop Abusive and Violent Environments in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Miller, Edward)
June 18, 2024 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A R Miller on behalf of Stop Abusive and Violent Environments (Miller, Edward)
June 17, 2024 Filing 35 Brief re #24 Response in Opposition to Motion, 27 Order,, . (Kopplin, Rebecca)
June 17, 2024 Filing 34 Brief re 27 Order,, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay Effective Date filed by Alabama, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Independent Women's Law Center, Independent Women's Network, Parents Defending Education, South Carolina, State of, Speech First, Inc. (Norris, Cameron)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #28 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Lauren E. Van Driesen. The Clerk's Office sends all orders and court notices to counsel electronically. If not already registered, attorney shall register for a PACER account. She may then request filing privileges for this court through the PACER website. Subsequently, she may enter a notice of appearance in this case. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/14/24. (SAC)
June 14, 2024 Filing 32 Brief re #30 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, 31 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by New Jersey, State of. (Goldfarb, Jon)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS the motion for leave to file an amicus brief. (Doc. #30 ). The amicus brief shall be filed on or before June 17, 2024. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/13/24. (SAC)
June 12, 2024 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by California, State of, New Jersey, State of, State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Proposed Brief)(Goldfarb, Jon)
June 12, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon C Goldfarb on behalf of California, State of, New Jersey, State of, State of Pennsylvania (Goldfarb, Jon)
June 11, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Lauren E. Van Driesen) by New Jersey, State of, California, State of, State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Designation as Local Counsel)(Goldfarb, Jon)
June 11, 2024 PHV Fee paid: $ 100, receipt number AALNDC-4612806. (Goldfarb, Jon) Modified on 6/11/2024 (CLC) ALND Receipt # B-12001
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER: The court ORDERS the parties to submit supplemental briefing that addresses the following question: When an agency engages in rulemaking, can it consider a circuit court decision that is adverse to its proposed rule but nevertheless reject the decision? The briefs may not exceed fifteen pages of 14-point Times New Roman font and are due on or before June 17, 2024. The length and timing of Plaintiffs' reply brief is unchanged. (See docs. #18 , 26). Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/10/2024. (CLC)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS the unopposed motion for an extension of the page limit. (Doc. #25 ). Plaintiffs' reply brief may not exceed thirty pages of 14-point Times New Roman font. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/7/2024. (CLC)
June 7, 2024 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Alabama, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Independent Women's Law Center, Independent Women's Network, Parents Defending Education, South Carolina, State of, Speech First, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norris, Cameron)
June 5, 2024 SUMMONS Returned Executed by South Carolina, State of, Independent Women's Network, Parents Defending Education, Independent Women's Law Center, Alabama, State of, Florida, State of, Speech First, Inc, Georgia, State of. Miguel Cardona served on 5/9/2024, answer due 7/8/2024; U.S. Department of Education served on 5/9/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. (See Affidavit of service #23 (KAM)
June 5, 2024 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay Effective Date filed by Miguel Cardona, U.S. Department of Education. (Kopplin, Rebecca)
June 5, 2024 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney; Miguel Cardona; USDOE; AG Merrick Garland on 5/6/2024; 5/9/2024; 5/9/2024; 5/10/2024, filed by Alabama, State of. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Green Cards)(LaCour, Edmund)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS the unopposed motion for an extension of the page limit. (Doc. #21 ). Defendants' response brief may not exceed sixty pages of 14-point Times New Roman. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 06/03/2024. (CLD)
June 3, 2024 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Miguel Cardona, U.S. Department of Education. (Kopplin, Rebecca)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER - The court RESETS oral argument on the motion to preliminary injunction for July 1, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. Central Standard Time in Courtroom 6B in the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, 1729 5th Avenue North, Birmingham. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/15/24. (SAC)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/15/24. (SAC)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Plaintiffs State of Alabama, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of South Carolina, Independent Women's Network, Independent Women's Law Center, Parents Defending Education, and Speech First, Inc., have moved for a preliminary injunction. #7 . The parties have jointly moved to set a briefing schedule and page limits for the briefing. #13 . The court GRANTS the motion to set briefing schedule and page limits. Defendants Miguel Cardona and the U.S. Department of Education may file a response to the motion for a preliminary injunction on or before June 5, 2024. Their brief may not exceed fifty pages of 14-point Times New Roman. Plaintiffs may file a reply brief on or before June 19, 2024. Their brief may not exceed twenty-five pages of 14-point Times New Roman. The court SETS oral argument on the motion for preliminary injunction for June 26, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. Central Standard Time in Courtroom 6B in the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, 1729 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/14/2024. (KAM)
May 13, 2024 PHV Fee paid: $100, receipt number B-44857 (KAM)
May 13, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to this case. Please use case number 7:24-cv-533-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. (KNS)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER On May 8, 2024, the plaintiffs filed a Motion for Stay of Effective Date or Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 7) challenging the United States Department of Education's recently published rule relating to Title IX of the Education Amendments Act of 1972. Because the rule will take effect on August 1, 2024, the plaintiffs are seeking a stay or preliminarily injunction and have requested an expedited briefing schedule. Doc. 13. At this time, the defendants have not appeared or responded to the complaint.The General Order calls for reassignment to a district judge after the first of three "triggering events" absent unanimous consent. None of these events have occurred in this case, and it does not appear they will occur in the timely manner contemplated in the General Order and necessitated by the nature of the relief requested in the Motion for Stay of Effective Date or Preliminary Injunction. Accordingly, the case is now due to be assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to reassign this case to a district judge randomly drawn.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 5/13/2024. (KNS)
May 11, 2024 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay Effective Date Keel Decl. filed by Alabama, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Independent Women's Law Center, Independent Women's Network, Parents Defending Education, South Carolina, State of, Speech First, Inc. (Norris, Cameron)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Before the court is the #12 motion to allow Joseph David Spate to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of South Carolina. The motion, which includes the information required under the Local Rules, is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED, subject to payment of the applicable fee on or before May 17, 2024. Upon receipt of the required fee, this conditional grant of pro hac vice status will become final without further court action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 05/10/2024. (SUH)
May 9, 2024 Filing 13 Joint MOTION Set Briefing Schedule and Page Limit for Pending Motion by Alabama, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Independent Women's Law Center, Independent Women's Network, Parents Defending Education, South Carolina, State of, Speech First, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norris, Cameron)
May 8, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph David Spate by South Carolina, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Designation as Local Counsel)(Taylor, Bryan)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The #9 motion to allow Stephen J. Petrany to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Georgia is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 5/8/2024. (CMD)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The #8 motion to allow James Hamilton Percival to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Florida is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 5/8/2024. (CMD)
May 8, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen J. Petraney by Georgia, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Designation as Local Counsel)(Taylor, Bryan)
May 8, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James Hamilton Percival, II, by Florida, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Designation as Local Counsel)(Taylor, Bryan)
May 8, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION to Stay Effective Date by Alabama, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Independent Women's Law Center, Independent Women's Network, Parents Defending Education, South Carolina, State of, Speech First, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Purcell Decl., #3 Affidavit Mackey Decl., #4 Affidavit Sikes Decl., #5 Affidavit Brickhouse Decl., #6 Affidavit Hebda Decl., #7 Affidavit Burns Decl., #8 Affidavit Woods Decl., #9 Affidavit Hardee Decl., #10 Affidavit Weaver Decl., #11 Affidavit Mailman Decl., #12 Affidavit Neily Decl., #13 Affidavit Trump Decl., #14 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Norris, Cameron)
May 8, 2024 PHV Fee paid: $ 100, receipt number AALNDC-4587434. (Taylor, Bryan) Modified on 5/8/2024- ALND Rec # B-11432 (KNS).
May 8, 2024 PHV Fee paid: $ 100, receipt number AALNDC-4587437. (Taylor, Bryan) Modified on 5/8/2024. ALND Rec# B-11433(KNS).
May 3, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on All Defendants on May 2, 2024, filed by Alabama, State of. (LaCour, Edmund)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: It is ORDERED that the #3 & #4 motions to allow Cameron Thomas Norris and Thomas Samuel Vaseliou to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Independent Womens Law Center, Independent Womens Network, Parents Defending Education, and Speech First, Inc. are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 05/03/2024. (SUH)
May 3, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Thomas L. Vaseolieu by Independent Women's Law Center, Independent Women's Network, Parents Defending Education, Speech First, Inc. (Taylor, Bryan)
May 3, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Cameron T. Norris by Independent Women's Law Center, Independent Women's Network, Parents Defending Education, Speech First, Inc. (Taylor, Bryan)
May 3, 2024 PHV Fee paid: $ 100, receipt number AALNDC-4584175. (Taylor, Bryan) Modified on 5/3/2024. ALND Receipt # B-11333 (KNS).
May 3, 2024 PHV Fee paid: $ 100, receipt number AALNDC-4584146. (Taylor, Bryan) Modified on 5/3/2024. ALND Receipt # B-11332 (KNS).
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued by the clerk as to Miguel Cardona, U.S. Department of Education, USAO, DOJ. Delivered to Plaintiffs for service. (KNS)
April 30, 2024 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4581547. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Miguel Cardona, U.S. Department of Education, filed by South Carolina, State of, Independent Women's Network, Parents Defending Education, Independent Women's Law Center, Alabama, State of, Florida, State of, Speech First, Inc, Georgia, State of. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS). (LaCour, Edmund) Modified on 4/30/2024- Receipt # B-11271(KNS).
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Miguel Cardona, U.S. Department of Education, filed by South Carolina, State of, Independent Women's Network, Parents Defending Education, Independent Women's Law Center, Alabama, State of, Florida, State of, Speech First, Inc, Georgia, State of. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alabama, State of et al v. Cardona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama, State of
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr.
Represented By: Steve Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida, State of
Represented By: James H. Percival, II
Represented By: Bryan McDaniel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia, State of
Represented By: Stephen J. Petrany
Represented By: Bryan McDaniel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina, State of
Represented By: Joseph D Spate
Represented By: Bryan McDaniel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Independent Women's Network
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Represented By: Thomas S. Vaseliou
Represented By: Bryan McDaniel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parents Defending Education
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Represented By: Thomas S. Vaseliou
Represented By: Bryan McDaniel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Speech First, Inc
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Represented By: Thomas S. Vaseliou
Represented By: Bryan McDaniel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Independent Women's Law Center
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Represented By: Thomas S. Vaseliou
Represented By: Bryan McDaniel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Cardona
Represented By: Rebecca Kopplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education
Represented By: Rebecca Kopplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Jersey, State of
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California, State of
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Stop Abusive and Violent Environments
Represented By: Edward A R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?