Beaty, et al v. Schriro, et al

Petitioner: Donald Edward Beaty
Respondent: Terry Stewart, Grant Woods and Dora B Schriro
Case Number: 2:1992cv02076
Filed: January 8, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2011 356 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Unopposed Motion for Authorization for Habeas Counsel to Conduct State-Court Litigation. (Doc. 355). The Federal Public Defender is authorized to represent Petitioner Beaty in state court to pursue successive state post-conviction relief on the basis of the United States Supreme Court's grant of certiorari in Maples v. Thomas, No. 10-63, 2011 WL 940889 (U.S. March 21, 2011), as well as any clemency proceedings. See Harbison v. Bell, 129 S. Ct. 1481, 1489 n.7 & 1491 (2009). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/22/11.(LAD)
August 31, 2010 351 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY - IT IS ORDERED denying issuance of a certificate of appealability re 350 Notice of Appeal; this Court is without jurisdiction in the matter. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/31/10.SAT)
August 12, 2010 349 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED denying Petitioner's 348 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/12/10. (SAT)
June 23, 2010 346 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the 343 Stipulation for order allowing confidential contact visit with Petitioner. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court update the title of this case to reflect the substitution of Charles L. Ryan as the Director of the Department of Corrections. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 06/23/10. (ESL)
January 8, 2010 341 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 340 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Edward Charland terminated. FURTHER ORDERED requiring any outstanding interim voucher be submitted for payment within 30 days of this order. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/8/10.(LAD, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaty, et al v. Schriro, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Edward Beaty
Represented By: Dale A Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terry Stewart
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Grant Woods
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B Schriro
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?