Cook, et al v. Schriro

Petitioner: Daniel Wayne Cook
Respondent: Dora Schriro
Case Number: 2:1997cv00146
Filed: January 24, 1997
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(6) (Doc. 118) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Stay of Execution (Doc. 121) is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/6/12.(LAD)
June 7, 2012 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 115 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Clerk of Court shall file Petitioner's lodged Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(6) (Doc. 116). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents shall file a response to Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(b) no later than Monday, June 18, 2012. Because this Court has returned the state court record to the Arizona Supreme Court, Respondents shall append to their response co pies of any documents or transcripts from thestate court record relevant to consideration of Petitioners motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner may file a reply no later than Monday,June 25, 2012. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/7/12.(LAD)
January 9, 2012 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 113 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; That Ashley Jane McDonald is withdrawn as counsel. Michael J. Meehan, Dale A. Baich, and Robin C. Konrad will remain as counsel for Mr. Cook. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 01/09/12.(ESL)
April 16, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 110 Stipulation for Order Allowing contact Visit between Daniel Wayne Cook and Dr Tora Brawley as set forth in this order; the Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to counsel of record, Michael Brodsky, Assistant Attorney General, Arizona Department of Corrections, and Warden Trujillo, Arizona State Prison, Eyman Prison Complex. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/16/10. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook, et al v. Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Wayne Cook
Represented By: Dale A Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora Schriro
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?