Schad, et al v. Stewart, et al

Petitioner: Edward Harold Schad
Respondent: Terry Stewart and George Herman
Case Number: 2:1997cv02577
Filed: December 16, 1997
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2013 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing as an unauthorized second or successive petition 145 Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(6). Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 9/18/13.(MAP)
September 13, 2013 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's 148 Motion for Leave to File Oversized Reply is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall file Petitioner's Reply to Response to Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 9/13/2013.(LFIG)
August 27, 2013 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's 142 Motion for Leave to File Oversized Motion for Relief from Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall file Petitioner's 143 Lodged Motion. ORDERED that Respondents shall file a response to Petitioner' ;s Motion for Relief from Judgment no later than Friday, September 6, 2013. Because the state court record has been returned to the Arizona Supreme Court, the response shall include as exhibits any parts of the state record Respondents believe are necessary for the Court's consideration of the motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner may file a reply no later than Friday, September 13, 2013. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 8/27/2013.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schad, et al v. Stewart, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward Harold Schad
Represented By: Kelley J Henry(Designation Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment)
Represented By: Henry Martin
Represented By: Denise I Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terry Stewart
Represented By: Jon George Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George Herman
Represented By: Jon George Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?