Hooper, et al v. Schriro, et al

Petitioner: Murray Hooper
Respondent: Dora B Schriro
Case Number: 2:1998cv02164
Filed: December 1, 1998
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2015 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 154 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief. Petitioner shall file his reply brief no later than 7/27/205. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/15/2015. (ACL)
January 26, 2015 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 145 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file his supplemental brief addressing the Martinez and Claim 16 issues no later than February 23, 2015. Respondents shall file their response to the supplemental brief no later than April 24, 2015. Petitioner shall file his reply to the supplemental brief no later than May 26, 2015. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/22/2015.(LFIG)
November 21, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 143 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file his supplemental brief addressing the Martinez and Claim 16 issues no later than January 23, 2015. Respondents shall file their response to the supplemental brief no later than March 27, 2015. Petitioner shall file his reply to the supplemental brief no later than April 24, 2015. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/21/2014.(ALS)
October 10, 2008 125 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER that Petitioner's Supplemental Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 29 31 is denied with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. ORDER that a Certificate of Appealability is granted as to the following issue: Claim 1 (see order for details). ORDER that the Clerk of Court send a courtesy copy of this Order to Rachelle M. Resnick, Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/9/08. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooper, et al v. Schriro, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Murray Hooper
Represented By: Dale A Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B Schriro
Represented By: Jon George Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?