March 18, 2014 |
Filing
521
ORDER granting 494 Defendant James Monroe's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and denying the motion to the extent that Defendant James Monroe is seeking attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/17/14.(LSP)
|
January 6, 2014 |
Filing
519
ORDER - ORDERED denying 515 Defendant James Monroe's Motion/Request for Evidentiary Hearing/Oral Argument. FURTHER ORDERED denying 517 Plaintiff's Joinder in Defendant Monroe's Motion/Request for Oral Argument and Motion for Expedited Hearing. (See attached Order for details.) Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/6/2014.(TLB)
|
December 30, 2013 |
Filing
518
ORDER that the Defendant James Monroe's 505 Request for Stay of Discovery is GRANTED in its entirety. ORDERED that the 514 Motion to Quash GRANTED and the November 1, 2013 subpoena issued by attorney David Bray is quashed without prejudice pending resolution of the defense 494 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/27/2013.(LFIG)
|
December 9, 2013 |
Filing
516
ORDER that: "Defendant James Monroe's Rule 42 Motion to Transfer; Motion to Suspend Deadlines and Motion for a Protective Order (Doc. 20 in No. CV-13 1113-PHX-SRB) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: the Clerk of the Court shall transfe r No. CV-13-1113 to this Court; and all future filings relating thereto shall reflect the new case number of CV-13-1113-PHX-RCB; and the Clerk of the Court shall file a copy of this order in CV-99-01427-PHX-RCB. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/6/2013. (KMG)
|
November 20, 2013 |
Filing
509
ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITH CONSENT that Holloway Odegard & Kelly, P.C., by and through Ryan P. Toftoy, be allowed to substitute as attorneys of record for Interested Party LaJunta E. Daniels in place of Patricia A. Gitre, P.L.C. and Barbara L. Hull for all further proceedings re granting 508 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/20/13.(TLJ)
|
July 31, 2013 |
Filing
487
ORDER re 486 Motion to Continue August 5, 2013 Show Cause Hearing filed by James A Monroe on July 30, 2013. Mr. Monroe requests to continue the 8/5/2013 order to show cause hearing for at least 60 to 90 days or alternatively, he request s permission to appear telephonically as he will be out of town on 8/5/2013. Because the Order to Show Cause Hearing is imminent, IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff James L. Gagan file and serve a response to this motion by no later than 9:00 a.m., Friday 8/2/2013. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/31/2013. (TLB)
|
April 8, 2013 |
Filing
478
ORDER that Plaintiff Gagan's 470 Motion to Compel is GRANTED; defendant James A. Monroe shall file complete and non-evasive discovery responses, without objection, on or before May 3, 2013; defendant James A. Monroe shall make himself avail able for a deposition within the next 45 days after the service of written discovery responses; and defendants James A. Monroe shall fully cooperate with plaintiff's counsel in establishing the date and time for his deposition; the Clerk of the Court shall place a copy of this order in the United States mail, to defendant James A. Monroe's two Scottsdale addresses; and provide defendant James A. Monroe with a copy of this order electronically to his last known e-mail address. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/8/2013.(LFIG)
|
April 1, 2013 |
Filing
475
ORDER granting attorney Carmichael's 451 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for defendant James A. Monroe; denying the 466 Order to Show; and ORDERS the Clerk of the Court to place a copy of this order in the United States mail, postage prepaid, first class to defendant James A. Monroe's two addresses in Scottsdale, AZ. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/1/2013.(LFIG)
|
March 22, 2013 |
Filing
472
ORDER re Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for March 26, 2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 606. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/22/2013. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
|
March 19, 2013 |
Filing
471
ORDER pursuant to the 469 Motion. ORDERED extending discovery deadline vis-a-vis Kimberly Sullivan to April 24, 2013. ORDERED that consistent with its prior Order, upon completion of such discovery of Ms. Sullivan the Court will set a hearing date within two weeks thereof. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/17/2013.(LFIG)
|
February 28, 2013 |
Filing
468
ORDER that the court hereby VACATES the 462 Order setting a hearing in this matter as to Kim Sullivan for March 1, 2013. Consistent with its prior order, upon completion of such discovery, the court will set a hearing date within two weeks thereof. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/28/2013. (LFIG)
|
February 27, 2013 |
Filing
466
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant/Judgment Debtor James A. Monroe shall appear for a Show Cause Hearing set on 3/26/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/26/13. (LFIG)
|
February 21, 2013 |
Filing
462
ORDER that a Hearing is set for 3/1/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/21/2013. (LFIG)
|
February 11, 2013 |
Filing
458
ORDER re 451 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney; that a response, if any, shall be filed by defendant James A. Monroe no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this order. A reply, if any shall be filed no later than seven (7) days after the date of entry of defendant Monroe's response. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/11/13. (DMT)
|
February 8, 2013 |
Filing
457
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 456 Motion. ORDERED Vacating the hearing set for 2/11/13 to be reset at a later date yet to be determined FURTHER ORDERED defendant Monroe shall provide responses to written discovery by no later than 2 /18/13 FURTHER ORDERED defendant Monroe shall make himself available for deposition within the next 45 days after written discovery responses are served FURTHER ORDERED plaintiff shall have an extension of 45 days from the date of entry of this or der by which to complete discovery with respect to garnishee defendant Kim Sullivan. To the extent plaintiff is seeking an order requiring garnishee defendant Sullivan to provide responses to written discovery no later than 2/18/13, the court DENIES that aspect of plaintiff's motion as duplicative in light of this court's November 19, 2012 order (Doc. 449 ). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/8/13. (cc: All Cnsl/K Sullivan) (MAP)
|
November 19, 2012 |
Filing
449
ORDER granting the 429 Request for Discovery re Kimberly Sullivan; such discovery shall be completed within ninety (90) days of the date of entry of this order and the court shall set a hearing date within two (2) weeks after completion of that discovery. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/19/2012. (LFIG)
|
October 22, 2012 |
Filing
431
ORDER that the Court grants the 429 and 430 Requests. The Court will set a date for this continued hearing after resolution of the Judgment Creditor's Request for Discovery as to garnishee defendant, Kimberley Sullivan. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/22/2012.(LFIG)
|