Aloe Vera of America, et al v. USA, et al

Case Number: 2:1999cv01794
Filed: October 6, 1999
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2015 722 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs (Doc. 713 ) is denied as untimely. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Objections to Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs and Request for Hearing and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Doc. 717 ) is granted. The Clerk shall strike Document 716 from the record. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 07/21/15. (ATD)
February 11, 2015 710 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: ORDERED the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for Rex and Ruth Maughan (jointly) and against the United States in the amount of $1,000; for Aloe Vera of America, Inc. and against the United St ates in the amount of $1,000; for Gene Yamagata and against the United States in the amount of $1,000 on their claims for unauthorized disclosure under 26 U.S.C. § 7431(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk shall enter judgment fo r the United States and against Maughan Holdings, Incorporated; for the United States and against Yamagata Holdings, Incorporated on their claims for unauthorized disclosure under 26 U.S.C. § 7431(a). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/10/2015. (LFIG)
July 11, 2014 671 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - At the final pretrial conference held on 6/25/2014, the United States raised objections to certain of Plaintiffs' lay witnesses listed in the proposed final pretrial order. The Court has considered the Plaintiffs' memorandum filed in response to the United States' objections as well as the United States' responsive memorandum and rules as follows: ORDERED that Plaintiffs' witness Ishida may not testify at trial regarding proposed topic of testimony 2 (as list ed in Doc. 669 at 103). FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' witness Kobuna may not testify at trial regarding proposed topics of testimony 2, 4, 6, and 7 (as listed in Doc. 669 at 104). FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' witness Taniuchi may not testify at trial regarding proposed topic of testimony 2 (as listed in Doc. 669 at 102). FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' witness Fujikawa may not testify at trial regarding proposed topics of testimony 2, 4, 6, and 7 (as listed in Doc. 669 at 105). See attached Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/11/2014. (TLB)
July 7, 2014 663 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 630 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Watanabe from Trial, ORDERED denying 635 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Purported Expert Opinion of Toru Nakamura Regarding Damages and Causation, and ORDERED denying 636 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Purported Expert Opinion of Toru Nakamura Regarding the Media in Japan. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/7/2014.(TLB)
April 30, 2014 634 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - ORDERED granting in part and denying in part 632 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Exchange Marked Copies of Exhibits and to Set Dates for Certain Pretrial Motions. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall exchange trial exhibit lists on or be fore 5/23/2014. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall exchange marked copies of all trial exhibits on or before 6/6/2014. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties may not file any motions in limine. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file any moti ons to exclude expert testimony on or before 5/2/2014, with responses due fourteen (14) days after a motion is filed. Replies may not be filed. Motions and responses must comply with LRCiv 7.2(e). FURTHER ORDERED that the lead attorney for each part y shall attend the Final Pretrial Conference on 6/25/2014 at 11:00 AM (to be held at 401 W.Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona, Courtroom 503). All other attorneys may appear telephonically. FURTHER ORDERED setting an evidentiary hearing on 630 United States Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Watanabe from Trial for 6/25/2014 at 1:30 PM (to be held at 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona, Courtroom 503). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/29/2014.(TLB)
August 3, 2010 584 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plas' motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. #567) (seeking to have this Court find that all claims are not barred by the statute of limitations) is granted in part and denying in part as follows: As to Count I, "Commission vs . Price False Statement" and Plas Aloe Vera of America, Inc., Rex G. Maughan, Ruth G. Maughan, and Maughan Holdings, Inc., the motion is granted; As to Count I, "Commission vs. Price False Statement" and Plas Gene Yamagata and Yamagata Holdings, Inc. the motion is denied; As to Count I, "Unreported Income False Statement" the motion is granted; As to Count II, the motion is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that as to Count I "Commission vs. Price False Statement" and Pl as Gene Yamagata and Yamagata Holdings, Inc. the Court sua sponte dismisses this claim of these Plas because it is barred by the statute of limitations. FURTHER ORDERED that Dft's motion is dismiss Count II (Doc. #565) is granted because Count I I is barred by the statute of limitations. FURTHER ORDERED that as to the claims that the Court found were not barred by the statute of limitations, judgment is still granted in favor of Dft for the reasons stated in this Court's Order of Februa ry 2, 2007 (Doc. #526). FINALLY ORDERED that, consistent with the limited mandate in this case,and this Court having decided the issues raised in the limited mandate, the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to the Court of Appeals and shall close this case (and to the extent a further judgment of this Court is required, this Order shall also serve as the judgment on the statute of limitations issue). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/2/10.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aloe Vera of America, et al v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?