Gonzales, et al v. Schriro, et al

Petitioner: Ernest Valencia Gonzales
Respondent: Dora B Schriro and George Herman
Case Number: 2:1999cv02016
Filed: November 15, 1999
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2015 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioners Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 28 ) is DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stay of execution entered by this Court on November 1 6, 1999 (Doc. 3 ), is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting a certificate of appealability with respect to Claims 9, 14/15, and 27. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court forward a courtesy copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court, 1501 W. Washington, Phoenix, AZ 85007-3329. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/11/15. (LAD)
March 4, 2015 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 236 Motion (Request) for Ruling. The Court appreciates the matter being brought to its attention, and is attempting to resolve the remaining issues in this case in due course. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/3/15.(LAD)
September 10, 2014 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 228 Motion to Amend. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/10/14. (LAD)
January 30, 2014 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that, construed as a motion for suspension from Local Rule Civil 15.1(a), Petitioner's Motion for Partial Reconsideration or Clarification (Doc. 226 ) is GRANTED IN PART as set forth herein. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/29/14. (LAD)
January 23, 2014 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice the 221 Motion to Amend and/or Supplement the Memorandum on the Merits; denying without prejudice the 222 Motion to Stay Proceeding Pending Restoration. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/23/14. (LAD)
July 23, 2013 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 210 Motion for Recusal/Reassignment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall substitute Charles L. Ryan, Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections, as a Respondent in place of his predecessor Dora B. Schriro, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(d)(1). (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/23/13. (LAD)
July 1, 2013 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than September 20, 2013, Petitioner shall file a merits brief regarding the above-listed claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents shall file a response to the merits brief no later than October 18, 2013. If Petitioner files a reply, he shall do so no later than November 8, 2013. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/1/13. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales, et al v. Schriro, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ernest Valencia Gonzales
Represented By: Timothy Michael Gabrielsen
Represented By: Leticia Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B Schriro
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George Herman
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?