EEOC v. Peabody Coal Company, et al

Case Number: 2:2001cv01050
Filed: June 13, 2001
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2012 276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER For the reasons above, DOI's Third-Party Defendants' Motion for SummaryJudgment as to Peabody Western Coal Company's Third-Party Complaint at docket 243 is hereby GRANTED, and the Nation's Renewed Motion 251 to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, on the Merits of Navajo Tribal Preference in Employment is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of Court will please enter judgment dismissing plaintiff's claims with prejudice and dismissing all third-party claims and counterclaims without prejudice. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 10/17/2012.(KMG)
September 20, 2012 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 228 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 9/20/12.(JWS)
March 7, 2012 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying without prejudice 196 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. See PDF document for content. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 3/7/12.(JWS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EEOC v. Peabody Coal Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?