Djerf v. Ryan, et al

Petitioner: Richard Kenneth Djerf
Respondent: George Herman and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 2:2002cv00358
Filed: February 27, 2002
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2015 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Petitioner's 117 Motion for Leave to Issue Subpoena. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/12/15.(LAD)
July 6, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 104 Petitioner's Request for Indication WhetherCourt Would Consider Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b) ; denying as moot 110 Respondents' Motion for extention of time to submit its response to Petitioner's request for indication. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/6/09.(DMT, )
May 27, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting Respondents' 108 Motion for an Extension of Time. Respondents shall file a response to Petitioner's motion by 6/15/09. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/27/09.(SAT)
October 31, 2008 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY; denying Petitioner's 97 Motion to alter or amend judgment; granting in part and denying in part petitioner's 98 Motion to expand his certificate of appealability; the Certificate of Appeal ability is amended to include the following issues: Whether the Court erred in determining that Claim One, alleging that Petitioner's waiver of counsel was involuntary because he was forced to proceed pro se due to incompetent counsel, is withou t merit, AND Whether the Court erred in determining that Claim Four, alleging ineffective assistance of at sentencing based on counsel's failure to investigate and present mitigation information regarding his dysfunctional family background and mental health, is without merit. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/30/08.(REW, )
September 30, 2008 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER that Petitioner's 55 First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. The stay of execution entered by this court on 03/01/08 3 is VACATED. That a certificate of Appealability is GRANTED as to the following issue detailed in the attached pdf. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court send a courtesy copy of this Order to Rachelle M. Resnick, Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 09/29/08. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Djerf v. Ryan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Kenneth Djerf
Represented By: Michael Llewellyn Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George Herman
Represented By: Jim D Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Jim D Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?