Doerr, et al v. Ryan, et al

Petitioner: Eugene Allen Doerr
Respondent: Charles Goldsmith and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 2:2002cv00582
Filed: April 3, 2002
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2010 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying petitioner's 151 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/31/10.(LAD)
February 11, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 146 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Relief from Judgment. The Clerk shall file Petitioner's lodged Motion for Relief from Judgment (Dkt. 146, Appendix A.). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is GRANTED. The Clerk shall vacate the Judgment Order entered on 9/28/09. The Court having considered and found procedurally barred the last of Petitioner's outstanding claims, 82 Petitioner's First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/10/10.(LSP)
September 28, 2009 141 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER that Petitioner's 82 First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. It is Further Ordered the stay of execution entered on April 4, 2002 (Dkt. 2) is VACATED. It is further ordered that a Certificate of Appealability is GRANTED as to the following issue: Whether Petitioner is entitled to relief on Claim 3, alleging that remarks by two prospective jurors at voir dire irreparably tainted the entire jury panel in violation of his right to an impartial jury. It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court send a courtesy copy of this Order to Rachelle M. Resnick, Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 09/28/09. (NOTE: See attached pdf for full details) (ESL)
September 10, 2008 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 139 Respondents' Motion for Order to Release Property. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/10/08.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doerr, et al v. Ryan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eugene Allen Doerr
Represented By: Robin C Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles Goldsmith
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?