Parra, et al v. Bashas' Inc

Plaintiff: Jose Parra, Gonzalo Estrada and Aurelia Martinez
Defendant: Bashas' Inc
Intervenor: United Food & Commercial Workers Union and Local 99 United Food & Commercial Workers Union
Objector: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Case Number: 2:2002cv00591
Filed: October 16, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2014 320 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting the Parties' Stipulated Request to approve the Amended Class Notice 319 , and exh. 1 thereto, with the additions as detailed in this order. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/2/14. (REW)
April 1, 2014 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - denying 309 Bashas' Motion for Reconsideration of Order Certifying Class on Plaintiffs' Pay Claim. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation (Doc. 316 ), the class definition is AMENDED and the class is defined as set forth in the attached Order. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this Order, in conformity with Fed.R.Civ. P. 23(c)(2)(B), the parties shall submit jointly an agreed upon form of notice, incorporating the amended class definition set forth i n the attached Order, a joint proposal for dissemination of the notice, and the time-line for opting out of the action. The plaintiffs must bear the costs of the notice, which shall include mailing by first-class mail. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/31/2014.(TLB)
June 28, 2013 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 311 Stipulation. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration for the Class Certification Order is due 7/15/2013. ORDERED that Defendant's reply brief in support of Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of the Class Certification Order is due on 7/29/2013. The parties' joint submission of a Class Notice, Notice Plan and Timeline is due on 7/29/2013. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/28/2013. (TLB)
June 24, 2013 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - In accordance with LRCiv 7.2(g)(2), ORDERED plaintiffs file response to 309 Bashas' Motion for Reconsideration no later than fourteen (14) days from date of entry of this Order. ORDERED a reply, if any, be filed no later than seven (7) days after service of the response. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/21/13. (TLB)
May 31, 2013 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 159 Motion for Class Certification to the extent they are seeking certification of a class with respect to pay pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23(b)(3). In that regard, the court certifies a class as follows: All Hispanic workers currently and formerly employed by defendant Bashas' Inc. in an hourly position at any Food city retail store since April 4, 1998, who have been subject to the challenged pay policies and practices. FURTHER ORDERED that the working conditions claim is D ECERTIFIED; and FINALLY ORDERED that in conformity with Fed.R.Civ. P. 23(c)(2)(B), within thirty (30) days of the date of entry of this order, the parties shall submit jointly an agreed upon form of notice, a joint proposal for dissemination of the notice, and the time-line for opting out of the action. Plaintiffs must bear the costs of the notice, which shall include mailing by first-class mail. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/31/13. (MAP)
August 26, 2011 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 299 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS re Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Supplemental briefs are due on or before 9/2/11. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/26/11.(TLJ)
December 15, 2010 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' 294 Motion (request) for Ruling at this time is denied. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/15/10.(ESL)
October 16, 2009 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 289 Motion to Modify Protective Orders. The Stipulated Protective Order filed on October 23, 2003 and Protective Order filed February 23, 2004 in this case shall be modified as indicated in this order. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/15/09. (see order for details)(DMT, )
April 15, 2009 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Dfts' 281 Motion to Transfer EEOC's Subpoena Enforcement Action, CV09-209-PHX-JAT is granted. A copy of this order shall be provided to United States District Court Judge James A. Teilborg. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 04/15/09. (ESL)
December 31, 2008 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Pla's 269 Request/Motion set set Status Conference, Status Conference shall be held, if at all, on 2/2/2009 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Robert C Broomfield. Dft's 270 Motion is denied without prejudice to renew insofar as it is seeking a stay, but is granted, as set forth above, to the extent dft is seeking an extension of time in which to respond. Dft has until 01/13/09, by which to file and serve its response to Plas' "Motion to Set Status Conference". Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/31/08. (NOTE: SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR FULL DETAILS) (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parra, et al v. Bashas' Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Parra
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Estrada
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurelia Martinez
Represented By: Jocelyn D Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bashas' Inc
Represented By: Douglas David Janicik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United Food & Commercial Workers Union
Represented By: Elizabeth A Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Local 99 United Food & Commercial Workers Union
Represented By: Elizabeth A Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Mary Joleen O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?