Merchant Transaction v. Nelcela Incorporated, et al

Plaintiff: Merchant Transaction Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Nelcela Inc, Len Campagna, Alec Dollarhide, Ebocom Inc and Post Integrations, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Nelcela Inc, Len Campagna and Alec Dollarhide
Cross_claimant: Nelcela Inc, Len Campagna, Alec Dollarhide and Post Integrations, Inc.
Cross_defendant: Post Integrations, Inc., Ebocom Inc and Nelcela Inc
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Nelcela Inc, Len Campagna, Alec Dollarhide and Post Integrations, Inc.
Thirdparty_defendant: Mary Gerdts, Douglas McKinney, Gene Clothier, Tone Clothier, Alec Dollarhide, Diane Dollarhide, Len Campagna, Helga Terry Campagna, Flora Kubitz and Carl Kubitz
Movant: Flora Kubitz and Carl Kubitz
Case Number: 2:2002cv01954
Filed: January 21, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2011 975 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's motion for charging order against the interest of defendant/judgment debtor Leonard Campagna and judgment debtor Helga Terry Campagna in the Arizona limited liability company registered as KLCADO, LLC 961 . ORDER DENYING all other requested relief as unnecessary re Adopting Report and Recommendation 974 . Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/5/11. (TLJ)
April 5, 2011 958 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that MTSI Parties' Motion For Amended Order Re: Substitution of Counsel, doc. 955, is GRANTED. The Court hereby approves the substitution of the law firm of Lewis and Roca LLP and attorneys Robert H. McKirgan, Kimberly A. Demarchi and Mich ael J. Hammer to represent MTSI, Gene Clothier and Tone Clothier in this matter. William McKinnon and Nicholas DiCarlo of DiCarlo, Caserta & Phelps PLLC are hereby withdrawn and substituted out as counsel of record for MTSI, Gene Clothier and Tone Clothier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/4/11.(KMG)
March 23, 2011 957 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, awarding the POST Parties $2,669,766.44 in attorneys' fees; awarding MTSI $600,931.85 in attorneys' fees; granting the POST Parties' 922 Motion to Transfer to a Magistrate Judge, directing the Clerk to refer this cas e to a magistrate judge for all post-judgment proceedings; directing the Clerk to reassign this case. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/23/11.LATER: Case has been reassigned, by random lot, to Judge Frederick J Martone and referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson for post-judgment proceedings. All future pleadings has contain the case number CV 02-1954-PHX-FJM. (REW)
April 2, 2010 860 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER denying the Nelcela Defendants' Motion to Amend/Alter Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion for a New Trial Regarding Damages, 752 .Denying the Nelcela Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or In the Al ternative, Motion to Amend the Judgment, or in the alternative, Motion for a New Trial, 759 . Denying the POST Parties Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law-or-Motion to Amend Judgment to Conform to Evidence, 756 . Granting POST Parties� 39; Motion to Vacate Judgment and Enter Amended Judgment, 748 . The Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the Clerk's Judgment to: (1) award MTSI $310,800.00 in exemplary damages; (2) consolidate and offset the Nelcela Defendants' a nd the POST Parties' damages awards, resulting in a single award to the POST Parties for $2,998,228; (3) and indicate that the POST Parties and MTSI are each entitled to post-judgment interest on their damages awards in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1961 from the date of the Judgment until the Judgment is satisfied. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 4/1/10. (DMT)
March 31, 2010 859 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 754 MTSI's Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 755 POST Parties' Motion for Attorney Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses. MTSI and the POST Parties must submit revised fee applications in accordance with the Court's directives in the body of this Order within 30 days. Denying as moot 807 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/31/10. (see order for full details)(DMT)
January 29, 2010 841 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Campagna must notify the POST Parties no later than 10 days before KLCADO, LLC attempts to transfer, encumber, or lien any real property interest it possesses.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Temporary Restraining Order entered on January 21, 2010 (Dkt. #830). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 1/29/10. (KSP)
January 21, 2010 830 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 829 Motion for Temporary Reastraining Order. ORDERED that a temporary restraining order be issued immediately this day of 1/21/10 FURTHER ORDERED that Leonard Campagna be heard on 1/28/10 at 2:00 PM in this Court, at a hearing held pursuant to Rule 65 of the Fed.R.Civ.P regarding the issuance of a preliminary injunction against Leonard Campagna. FURTHER ORDERED pursuant to Rule 65 of Fed.R.Civ.P., that the POST Parties are to post a bond in the amount of $50,000 to make g ood such damages (not to exceed the amount of the bond stated above) as may be suffered or sustained by any party who was found to be wrongfully restrained. The bond shall be posted within three business days of this Order. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 1/21/10. (MAP)
August 7, 2009 702 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 701 Motion for Extension of Time for deadlines - Phase II Trial reset for 8/12/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Mary H Murguia. Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2009 10:30 AM before Judge Mary H Murguia.. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/7/09. (see order for full details)(DMT, )
July 28, 2009 690 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/28/09. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting MTSIs motion for partial reconsideration. (Dkt. #662).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying the Nelcela Parties motion in limine to exclude evidence of copyright ownership by MTSI. (Dkt. #645).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting the Joint Parties motion in limine to exclude Nelcela Authorization System source code not timely produced. (Dkt. #649).(KSP)
July 24, 2009 685 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting MTSI's moton for partial reconsideration 662 ; denying 645 Motion in Limine; granting 649 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/24/09.(KSP) Modified on 8/10/2009, AMENDED ORDER 690 filed on 7/28/09, (LSP).
July 2, 2009 652 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER clarifying the Court's remark in footnote 11 of the Court's June 25, 2009 order. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/2/09. (KSP)
June 25, 2009 636 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 615 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 621 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 6/25/09.(KSP)
March 18, 2009 607 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: analytical dissection. Status Hearing set for 4/14/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Mary H Murguia. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/17/09. (KSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merchant Transaction v. Nelcela Incorporated, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merchant Transaction Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J DiCarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelcela Inc
Represented By: Merrick Brian Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Len Campagna
Represented By: Merrick Brian Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alec Dollarhide
Represented By: Merrick Brian Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebocom Inc
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Demarchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Post Integrations, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Demarchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Nelcela Inc
Represented By: Merrick Brian Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Len Campagna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Alec Dollarhide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Nelcela Inc
Represented By: Merrick Brian Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Len Campagna
Represented By: Merrick Brian Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Alec Dollarhide
Represented By: Merrick Brian Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Post Integrations, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Demarchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Post Integrations, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Demarchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Ebocom Inc
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Demarchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Nelcela Inc
Represented By: Merrick Brian Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Nelcela Inc
Represented By: Merrick Brian Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Len Campagna
Represented By: Merrick Brian Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Alec Dollarhide
Represented By: Merrick Brian Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Post Integrations, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Demarchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Mary Gerdts
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Demarchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Douglas McKinney
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Demarchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Gene Clothier
Represented By: Nicholas J DiCarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Tone Clothier
Represented By: Nicholas J DiCarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Alec Dollarhide
Represented By: Veronica Lynn Manolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Diane Dollarhide
Represented By: Veronica Lynn Manolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Len Campagna
Represented By: Veronica Lynn Manolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Helga Terry Campagna
Represented By: Veronica Lynn Manolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Flora Kubitz
Represented By: George Chun Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Carl Kubitz
Represented By: George Chun Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Flora Kubitz
Represented By: George Chun Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Carl Kubitz
Represented By: George Chun Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?