Century 21 Real Esta v. Century Insurance, et al

Plaintiff: Century 21 Real Estate Corporation
Defendant: Century Surety Company
Counter_claimant: Century Surety Company
Counter_defendant: Century 21 Real Estate Corporation
Case Number: 2:2003cv00053
Filed: January 9, 2003
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2009 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties have until June 26, 2009 to submit a status report to the Court as to whether the pending Motion for Attorney Fees and Motion for Withdrawal can be vacated due to the parties' settlement. Status Report due by 6/26/2009. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/19/09. (KMG, )
April 13, 2009 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the present case is stayed until 06/18/09 to allow certain performance to be completed, as required by the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 04/13/09. (ESL)
March 23, 2009 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 271 Stipulated Motion to Extend Opposition Filing Deadline; the parties have until 4/10/09 to memorialize their settlement agreement in writing; the pending 270 Motion for Withdrawal is stayed until the Court is notified of the parties' settlement or Century 21 files its Opposition (see order for further details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/23/09.(REW, )
March 13, 2009 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 268 Stipulation for Extension of Time. ORDER that the deadline for Century 21 to respond to Century Surety's Motion for Attorneys' Fees is extended to 3/23/09. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/12/09. (TLJ)
February 27, 2009 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 266 Stipulation for Extension of Time; the deadline for Century 21 to respond to Century Surety's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses is extended to 3/16/09. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/27/09. (REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Century 21 Real Esta v. Century Insurance, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Century 21 Real Estate Corporation
Represented By: Rick Neeley Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Surety Company
Represented By: Sara V Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Century Surety Company
Represented By: David E Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Century 21 Real Estate Corporation
Represented By: Rick Neeley Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?