Bard Peripheral Vasc, et al v. WL Gore & Associates, et al

Plaintiff: David Goldfarb and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Defendant: W.L. Gore and Associates, Inc.
Counter_claimant: W.L. Gore and Associates, Inc.
Counter_defendant: David Goldfarb, C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2003cv00597
Filed: March 28, 2003
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 1145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 1122 Request for Judicial Notice of Decision on Request for Reexamination of United States Patent No. 6,436,135 is denied as moot. ORDERED that Defendant's 1113 Motion for New Trial or in the Alternative to Amend the Judgment is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 1109 Motion for Leave to Execute on the Judgment is granted regarding the final and non-appealable issues. Any stay previously issued by the Court concerning the final and non-appealable issues in the Amended Clerk's Judgment is lifted. Plaintiffs shall submit a proposed Order. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 10/16/2013.(LFIG)
April 14, 2009 951 Opinion or Order of the Court REDACTED ORDER (Re: Sealed Order 941 , filed 3/31/09) ORDER denying 910 Motion to Strike the Sininger Declaration FURTHER ORDERED granting in part 868 Motion for Enhanced Damages. Plaintiffs' damages award is doubled from $185,589,871. 02 to $371,179,742.04. FURTHER ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' 850 Motion for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Costs. Plaintiffs are awarded $19 million in attorney fees and non-taxable costs. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/31/09. (MAP)
March 31, 2009 942 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 852 Motion for Prejudgment Interest; granting 854 Motion to Supplement; granting 855 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting in part and denying in part 856 Motion for Permanent Injunction; granting 918 Motion for Leave to File. W ithin 15 days of this Order, after having met and conferred, the Parties shall file a joint proposed schedule for the Courts approval. Any proposed schedule must be consistent with the dictates of the instant Order. The Court further notes that the issue of supplemental damages will be decided based on the Parties briefs, along with any exhibits.Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/31/09.(KSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bard Peripheral Vasc, et al v. WL Gore & Associates, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Goldfarb
Represented By: Steven C Cherny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Steven C Cherny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.L. Gore and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Kemp Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: W.L. Gore and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Kemp Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: David Goldfarb
Represented By: Steven C Cherny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Steven C Cherny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Steven C Cherny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?