Fidelity Natl Fin v. Friedman, et al

Case Number: 2:2003cv01222
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: O Office
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: O

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2012 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER In sum, because Fidelity did not timely file a renewal affidavit as Arizona law requires, and because it did not timely "re-register" its Arizona judgment, the court hereby ORDERS that: (1) defendants' "Request for Ruling C onsistent with Ninth Circuit Mandate" (Doc. 327 ) is GRANTED; and (2) that plaintiffs' "Certification of Judgment for Registration in Another District (dated January 1, [sic] 2007) and Renewal of Judgment in District of Arizona" (Doc. 148 ) is VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/1/2012. (NOTE: See PDF for complete details.)(KMG)
March 15, 2010 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 264 Request for "Motion for Discharge of the O.S.C." by Allen Hyman; granting the 268 Request to Take Judicial Notice by Allen Hyman; and Fidelity's Order to Show Cause seeking to hold in contempt defendants, The Anna and Noach Kramer Irrevocable Insurance Trust; Anita Meshkatai, individually and as trustee of the Anita Kramer Living Trust, dated July 23, 1987; and Farid Meshkatai; and nonparties, Daniel Campbell and Allen Hyman is in all respects denied. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/12/10.(REW)
March 31, 2009 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER "Fidelity's Motion to Strike Farid and Anita Meshkatai's Response 228 to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for an Order to Show Cause re: Civil Contempt for Violation of the Court's Orders to Yariv Elazar as not Authorized by Statute, Rule, or Court Order" 230 is GRANTED; Fidelity's "Motion for an Order to Show Cause re: Civil Contempt against Farid Meshkatai, Anita Meshkatai, the Kramer Insurance Trust, Daniel Campbell, and Allen Hyman for Violations of the Courts Orders to Yariv Elazar" 191 is GRANTED; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Farid Meshkatai, Anita Meshkatai, the Anna and Noach Kramer Irrevocable Insurance Trust, Daniel J. Campbell, and Allen Hyman shall appear, in perso n or by telephone, for a scheduling conference to be held on April 20, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. At that time, among other things, the court will establish a date for a hearing on this Motion and Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/30/09.(KMG)
November 6, 2008 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 186 - Denying Fidelity's request to have an official transcript of the oral argument before Judge Duncan designated as a part of the record of appeal. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/6/08. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity Natl Fin v. Friedman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?