Mazet v. Halliburton Co Long-, et al

Case Number: 2:2004cv00493
Filed: March 11, 2004
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2011 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees and non-taxable costs for a total award of $183,007.39 (doc. 115). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/1/2011.(KMG)
January 18, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART the motion to enforce judgment (doc. 116). Plaintiff is awarded prejudgment interest at the rate prescribed by 28 U.S.C. § 1961. The parties shall work cooperatively in order to properly calculate the amount of prejudgment interest. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/18/11.(KMG) .
September 16, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - REMANDING this case to the administrator for an immediate calculation and payment of benefits. The clerk shall enter final judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/15/10. (KMG)
April 9, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 97 the Plan's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/8/09.(TLJ)
September 24, 2008 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED DENYING the parties 100 Stipulation to extend the filing deadline. Defendants supporting memorandum is due no later than 10/28/08. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/24/08. (SAT)
February 5, 2008 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pla's 57 Motion for Summary Judgment and remanding this case to the administrator for further proceedings consistent with this order; denying dfts' 62 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; denying pla's 69 Motion for Reconsideration; denying pla's 70 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/5/2008.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazet v. Halliburton Co Long-, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?